EP2498271 - Charged particle beam device with aperture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ICT Integrated Circuit Testing Gesellschaft für Halbleiterprüftechnik mbH Ammerthalstrasse 20a 85551 Heimstetten / DE | [2012/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lanio, Stefan Eichendorffstrasse 1 85435 Erding / DE | 02 /
Frosien, Juergen Kufsteinerstrasse 16a 85521 Riemerling / DE | 03 /
Banzhof, Helmut Margeritenstrasse 12c 85586 Poing / DE | [2012/37] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2021/13] |
Former [2012/37] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12170499.3 | 20.10.2003 | [2012/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2498271 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2498271 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | [2012/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2498271 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/09 | [2012/38] | CPC: |
H01J37/09 (EP,US);
H01J2237/0455 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2021/13] |
Former [2012/37] | DE, GB, NL | Title | German: | Aperturblende für Teilchenstrahlapparat | [2012/37] | English: | Charged particle beam device with aperture | [2012/37] | French: | Ouverture pour un appareil à faisceaux de particules chargées | [2012/37] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/17] | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03023826.5 / EP1526563 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030023826) is 01.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 10.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 26.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 20.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 20.10.2021 | [2022/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS61255022 ; | [A]JPS553620 ; | [YA]EP0280375 (STICHTING TECH WETENSCHAPP [NL]) [Y] 1-6,13,14 * column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 5; figures 1,4 * [A] 8-12,15; | [Y]US4899060 (LISCHKE BURKHARD [DE]) [Y] 4,14 * column 5, line 31 - line 35; figures 3a-d *; | [YA]US5065034 (KAWANAMI YOSHIMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6,13,14 * column 6, line 47 - column 7, line 2; figures 4,9 * * column 7, line 52 - line 55 * [A] 8-12,15; | [A]US5276331 (OAE YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1,15 * column 4, line 21 - line 29; figure 1 * * column 5, line 26 - line 60 *; | [A]EP0660370 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,15 * column 8, line 54 - line 57 *; | [YA]US2002024021 (IWABUCHI YUKO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6,13,14 * paragraph [0046]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0050] * [A] 8-12,15 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870404), vol. 0111, no. 8, Database accession no. (E - 495), & JP61255022 A 19861112 (NEC CORP) [A] 1,15 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800308), vol. 0040, no. 28, Database accession no. (E - 1), & JP55003620 A 19800111 (JEOL LTD) [A] 1,15 * abstract * | by applicant | - J. FROSIEN; S. LANIO; H.P. FEUERBAUM, "High Precision electron optical system for absolute and CD-measurements on large specimens", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS AND METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, (1995), vol. 363 | - J. FROSIEN ET AL., NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS AND METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, (1995), vol. A 363 |