EP2668987 - Illuminating device for balloon [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yang, Jerry S.C. 8F-8, No. 20, Ta Lung Road West District Taichung City 40310 / TW | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 12170544.6 | 01.06.2012 | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2668987 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A63H27/10 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
A63H27/10 (EP);
F21V3/023 (EP);
A63H2027/1058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung für Ballon | [2013/49] | English: | Illuminating device for balloon | [2013/49] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage pour ballon | [2013/49] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 17.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0136065 (APOSTOLOV EVGUENI [BG]) [Y] 1-12 * figures 2, 3 and 6; page 19, line 18-page 20, line 2; page 27, lines 17-19 *; | [Y]EP1600690 (TANG SHU-LIEN [TW]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0009]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2009296372 (SCHRIMMER MICHAEL L [US]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0047]; figure 7A *; | [Y]WO2007092996 (LINFIELD PACIFIC PTY LTD [AU], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0021] and [0022]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US7699505 (YANG JERRY S C [TW]) [Y] 2-11 * column 2, line 49-column 3, line 29; figures 1, 4, 6 and 11 *; | [Y]US2006039138 (OXBORROW DOUGLAS GRANT [US]) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0026]; figures 2 and 3 * | by applicant | US7699505 | US5117344 | US5295891 | US7344267 | US7364488 | TWI338104B |