EP2617587 - Method for refueling and operating natural gas fueled truck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Ron C. 9 Fawn Run Bloomsbury, NJ New Jersey 08804 / US | 02 /
Newman, Michael D. 51 Woods Road Hillsborough, NJ New Jersey 08844 / US | 03 /
Shirley, Arthur I. 24 Powelson Drive Hillsborough, NJ New Jersey 08844 / US | 04 /
McCormick, Stephen A. 24 Pebble Ridge Road Warrington, PA Pennsylvania 18976 / US | 05 /
Jovanovic, Stevan 1275 Rock Avenue North Plainfield, NJ New Jersey 07060 / US | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Andreas, et al RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 33 02 11 80062 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Hofmann, Andreas, et al Richter Werdermann Gerbaulet Hofmann Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 11 80062 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12170633.7 | 01.06.2012 | [2013/30] | Priority number, date | US201213351508 | 17.01.2012 Original published format: US201213351508 | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2617587 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/32, F25D3/10, F17C9/00 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
B60H1/3202 (EP,US);
B60H1/3232 (EP,US);
F17C2221/014 (EP,US);
F17C2221/033 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0161 (EP,US);
F17C2223/033 (EP,US);
F17C2225/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2225/0161 (EP,US);
F17C2225/033 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0309 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0341 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0355 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0372 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0374 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0393 (EP,US);
F17C2260/021 (EP,US);
F17C2260/046 (EP,US);
F17C2265/066 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betanken und Betreiben eines erdgasbetriebenen Lastkraftwagens | [2013/30] | English: | Method for refueling and operating natural gas fueled truck | [2013/30] | French: | Procédé de ravitaillement et de fonctionnement de camion utilisant un gaz naturel | [2013/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 03.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/12] | 10.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5228295 (GUSTAFSON KEITH [US]) [A] 1,6 * column 4, lines 15-29; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0599625 (THERMO KING CORP [US]) [A] 1,7* page 12, lines 35-43; figure 7 *; | [XI]DE102010020476 (AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0045]; figures 1-3 * [I] 6 |