EP2532284 - Display apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntington, Justin 52 Parfrey Road Rochedale, South Queensland 4123 / AU | For all designated states Huntington, Randal 307 Riding Road Balmoral, Queensland 4171 / AU | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Georg-Schlosser-Straße 6 35390 Gießen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/50] | advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Georg-Schlosser-Straße 6 35390 Gießen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12171323.4 | 08.06.2012 | [2012/50] | Priority number, date | AU20110902242 | 07.06.2011 Original published format: AU 2011902242 | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2532284 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47F7/04, B62H3/00 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
A47F7/04 (EP,US);
B62H3/00 (EP,US);
A47F5/0087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung | [2012/50] | English: | Display apparatus | [2012/50] | French: | Appareil d'affichage | [2012/50] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/43] | 16.06.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]DE102010009123 (3B TEC AUFBEREITUNGSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-7,9-15 * abstract *; | [X]EP0587240 (THULE IND AB [SE]) [X] 1-7,9-15 * abstract *; | [X]WO2010024020 (LEED CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,11,12 * abstract *; | [X]DE4438924 (SICHERMANN ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1,15 * abstract *; | [X]US7946432 (SWANSON NEIL [US], et al) [X] 1,15 * abstract *; | [A]DE19805228 (BUCHERT FRED [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |