EP2522676 - Disintegrin variants and pharmaceutical uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Taiwan University No. 1, Sec. 4, Roosevelt Road Taipei / TW | For all designated states National Cheng Kung University No. 1, University Road Tainan City 701 / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | For all designated states National Taiwan University No. 1, Sec.4, Roosevelt Road Taipei / TW | ||
For all designated states National Cheng Kung University No. 1, University Road Tainan City 701 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chuang, Woei-Jer No 68, Alley 151 Lane 127 Nanyuan St North District Tainan / TW | 02 /
Fu, Wen-Mei 5F, -1, No 5, Sec 2 Xiuming Rd Wenshan District Taipei / TW | 03 /
Huang, Tur-Fu 5F, -1, No 5, Sec 2 Xiuming Rd Wenshan District Taipei / TW | 04 /
Huang, Wenya No 68, Alley 151 Lane 127, Nanyuan St North District Tainan / TW | 05 /
Tang, Chih-Hsin 24F, No. 10, Aly. 25, Ln. 346 Sec. 2, Chongde Rd. Beitun Dist. Taichung City 406 / TW | 06 /
Chen, Chiu-Yueh No. 338-1, Lihua Village Jiali Township Tainan / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | 01 /
Chuang, Woei-Jer No 68, Alley 151 Lane 127 Nanyuan St North District Tainan / TW | ||
02 /
Fu, Wen-Mei 5F, -1, No 5, Sec 2 Xiuming Rd Wenshan District Taipei / TW | |||
03 /
Huang, Tur-Fu 5F, -1, No 5, Sec 2 Xiuming Rd Wenshan District Taipei / TW | |||
04 /
Huang, Wenya No 68, Alley 151 Lane 127, Nanyuan St North District Tainan / TW | |||
05 /
Tang, Chih-Hsin 24F, No. 10, Aly. 25, Ln.346 Sec. 2, Chongde Rd. Beitun Dist. Taichung City 406 / TW | |||
06 /
Chen, Chiu-Yueh No. 338-1, Lihua Village Jiali Township Tainan / TW | Representative(s) | Kingsbury, Oliver William, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/46] | Oldroyd, Richard Duncan Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 12171692.2 | 21.12.2007 | [2012/46] | Priority number, date | US20060871854P | 26.12.2006 Original published format: US 871854 P | [2012/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2522676 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2522676 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/46, C07K14/745, A61K38/00 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
C07K14/46 (EP,US);
A61K38/16 (KR);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/14 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K14/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/46] | Title | German: | Disintegrinvarianten und pharmazeutische Verwendungen damit | [2012/46] | English: | Disintegrin variants and pharmaceutical uses thereof | [2012/46] | French: | Variantes de disintégrine et leurs utilisations pharmaceutiques | [2012/46] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 18.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/21] | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07867921.4 / EP2124548 | Divisional application(s) | EP12180739.0 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 18.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5380646 (KNIGHT LINDA C [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * col. 6, SEQ. ID. NO.:10 *; | [Y]US5759996 (CHENG SOAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * col. 8; SEQ. ID. NO.:115; Fig. 2D, Example 2; col. 12, l. 20-40 *; | [Y]EP0382451 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * claims 2,5 *; | [Y]US6710030 (MARKLAND JR FRANCIS S [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * SEQ. ID. NO.:7; par. 26; Examples 14, 15 *; | [XY]JPH05255395 (TAKEDA CHEM IND LTD) [X] 1,2,5 * Fig. 20; par. 103; SEQ. ID. NO:63 * [Y] 3,6-15; | [Y]US2006246541 (MINEA RADU O [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-15 * par. 118-131, 134 * | [A] - CHANG CHIH-PEI ET AL, "Positional importance of Pro53 adjacent to the Arg49-Gly50-Asp51 sequence of rhodostomin in binding to integrin alphaIIbbeta3", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (20010701), vol. 357, no. 1, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 57 - 64, XP002574620 [A] 1-3,5-15 * abstract; Table 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/0264-6021:3570057 | [XY] - J.-F. DUBUISSON, "Tol-Pal proteins are critical cell envelope components of Erwinia chrysanthemi affecting cell morphology and virulence", MICROBIOLOGY, (20051001), vol. 151, no. 10, doi:10.1099/mic.0.28237-0, ISSN 1350-0872, pages 3337 - 3347, XP055049824 [X] 1,2,5 * database entry UNIPROT:Q937K7 * [Y] 3,6-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/mic.0.28237-0 | [ ] - "SubName: Full=YbgC protein;", UniProt, (20011201), Database accession no. Q937K7, URL: EBI [ ] * sequence . * | by applicant | US6974884 | US4640835 | US4496689 | US4301144 | US4670417 | US4791192 | US4179337 | WO9534326 | - HUNKAPILLER ET AL., NATURE, (1984), vol. 310, page 105 111 1 | - ZALLIPSKY, S., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1995), vol. 6, pages 150 - 165 | - MONFARDINI, C. ET AL., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (1995), vol. 6, pages 62 - 69 | - CHIH-HSIN, "Enhancement of Fibronectin Fibrillogenesis and Bone Formation by Basic Fibroblast Growth Factor via Protein Kinase C-Dependent Pathway in Rat Osteoblasts", MOL. PHARMACOL, (2004), vol. 66, pages 440 - 449 | - VAN'T HOF RJ; RALSTON SH., "Nitric oxide and bone.", IMMUNOLOGY, (2001), vol. 103, pages 255 - 61 | - GOLTZMAN D., "Discoveries, drugs and skeletal disorders.", NAT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2002), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd916, pages 784 - 96, XP009030374 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd916 | - YONEDA T; WILLIAMS PJ; HIRAGA T; NIEWOLNA M; NISHIMURA RA., "Bone- seeking clone exhibits different biological properties from the MDA-MB-231 parental human breast cancer cells and a brain-seeking clone in vivo and in vitro.", J BONE MINER RES, (2001), vol. 16, pages 1486 - 95 | - MUNDY G.R., "Metastasis to bone: causes, consequences and therapeutic opportunities.", NAT REV CANCER, (2002), vol. 2, pages 584 - 93 | - MIYAUCHI AJ; ALVAREZ EM; GREENFIELD A; TETI M; GRANO S; COLUCCI A; ZAMBONIN-ZALLONE FP; ROSS SL; TEITELBAUM, CHERESH D., "Recognition of osteopontin and related peptides by an ?v?3 integrin stimulates immediate cell signals in osteoclasts.", J BIOL CHEM, (1991), vol. 266, pages 20369 - 20374 | - CRIPPES BA; ENGLEMAN VW; SETTLE SL; DELARCO J; ORNBERG RL; HELFRICH MH; HORTON MA; NICKOLS GA., "Antibody to ß3 integrin inhibits osteociast- mediated bone resorption in the thyroparathyroidectomized rat.", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1996), vol. 137, pages 918 - 924 | - HORTON MA; TAYLOR ML; ARNETT TR; HELFRICH MH, "Arg-gly-asp (RGD) peptides and the anti-vitronectin receptor antibody 23C6 inhibit dentine resorption and cell spreading by osteoclasts.", EXP CELL RES, (1991), vol. 195, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-4827(91)90386-9, pages 368 - 375, XP024791657 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-4827(91)90386-9 | - ROSS FP; ALVAREZ JI; CHAPPEL J; SANDER D; BUTLER WT; FARACH-CARSON MC; MINTZ KA; ROBEY PG; TEITELBAUM SL; CHERESH DA, "Interactions between the bone matrix proteins osteopontin and bone sialoprotein and the osteoclast integrin ?vß3 potentiate bone resorption.", J BIOL CHEM, (1993), vol. 268, pages 9901 - 9907, XP002923586 | - INOUE M; TEITELBAUM SL; HURTER L; HRUSKA K; SEFTOR E; HENDRIX M; ROSS FP., "GM-CSF regulates expression of the functional integrins ?vß3 and ?vß5 in a reciprocal manner during osteoclastogenesis", J BONE MINER RES, (1995), vol. 10, page S163A | - MIMURA H; CAO X; ROSS FP; CHIBA M; TEITELBAUM SL., "1,25(OH)2D3 vitamin D3 transcriptionally activates the ß3-integrin subunit gene in avian osteoclast precursors.", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1994), vol. 134, pages 1061 - 1066 | - ENGLEMAN VW; NICKOLS GA; ROSS FP; HORTON MA; GRIGGS DW; SETTLE SL; RUMINSKI PG; TEITELBAUM SL., "A peptidomimetic antagonist of the alpha(v)beta3 integrin inhibits bone resorption in vitro and prevents osteoporosis in vivo.", J CLIN INVEST, (1997), vol. 99, pages 2284 - 2292 | - NAKAMURA I; TANAKA H; RODAN GA; DUONG LT, "Echistatin inhibits the migration of murine prefusion osteoclasts and the formation of multinucleated osteoclast-like cells.", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1998), vol. 139, pages 5182 - 5193 | - MUNDY G.R., "Mechanisms of osteolytic bone destruction.", BONE, (1991), doi:doi:10.1016/8756-3282(91)90057-P, pages S1 - 6, XP023248743 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/8756-3282(91)90057-P | - GOULD RJ; POLOKOFF MA; FRIEDMAN PA; HUANG TF; HOLT JC; COOK JJ; NIEWIAROWSKI S., "Disintegrins: a family of integrin inhibitory proteins from viper venoms.", PROC SOC EXP BIOL MED, (1990), vol. 195, pages 168 - 171 | - HUANG TF., "What have snakes taught us about integrins ?", CELL MOL LIFE SCI, (1998), vol. 54, doi:doi:10.1007/s000180050181, pages 527 - 540, XP000982222 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s000180050181 | - YEH CH; PENG HC; YANG RS; HUANG TF, "Rhodostomin, a snake venom disintegrin, inhibits angiogenesis elicited by basic fibroblast growth factor and suppresses tumor growth by a selective ?vß3 blockade of endothelial cells.", MOL PHARMACOL, (2001), vol. 59, pages 1333 - 1342, XP055076743 | - YANG, R.S.; TANG, C.H.; CHUANG, W.J.; HUANG, T.H.; PENG, H.C.; HUANG, T.F.; FU, W.M., "Inhibition of tumor formation by snake venom disintegrin.", TOXICON, (2005), vol. 45, doi:doi:10.1016/j.toxicon.2005.01.013, pages 661 - 669, XP004791519 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.toxicon.2005.01.013 | - LIN ET AL., BIOCEHMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2005), vol. 70, pages 1469 - 1478 | - CHANG ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (1993), vol. 190, pages 242 - 249 | - DEJANA E; VILLA S; DE GAETANO G., "Bleeding time in rats: a comparison of different experimental conditions.", THROMB HAEMOST, (1982), vol. 48, pages 108 - 11 | - YANG RS; WANG SS; LIN HJ; LIU T K; HANG YS; TSAI KS., "Differential effects of bone mineral content and bone area on vertebral strength in a swine model.", CALCIF TISSUE INT, (1998), vol. 63, pages 86 - 90 | - TANG CH; YANG RS; HUANG TH; LIU SH; FU WM., "Enhancement of fibronectin fibrillogenesis and bone formation by basic fibroblast growth factor via protein kinase C-dependent pathway in rat osteoblasts.", MOL PHARMACOL, (2004), vol. 66, pages 440 - 9 | - TURNER CH; AKHTER MP; HEANEY RP, "The effects of fluoridated water on bone strength.", ORTHOP RES, (1992), vol. 10, pages 581 - 587 | - TURNER CH; BURR DB., "Basic biomechanical measurements of bone: a tutorial", BONE, (1993), vol. 14, doi:doi:10.1016/8756-3282(93)90081-K, pages 595 - 608, XP023248639 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/8756-3282(93)90081-K | - WEINREB M; RODAN GA; THOMPSON DD., "Depression of osteoblastic activity in immobilized limbs of suckling rats.", J BONE MINER RES, (1991), vol. 6, pages 725 - 731 | - ZHANG, X. P.; KAMATA, T.; YOKOYAMA, K.; PUZON-MCLAUGHLIN, W.; TAKADA, Y., "Specific interaction of the recombinant disintegrin-like domain of MDC-15 (metargidin, ADAM-15) with integrin alphavbeta3", J BIOL CHEM, (1998), vol. 273, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.273.13.7345, pages 7345 - 7350, XP002201315 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.273.13.7345 | - WILKINSON-BERKA, J.L.; ALOUSIS, N.S.; KELLY D.J. ET AL., "COX-2 inhibition and retinal angiogenesis in a mouse model of retinopathy of prematurity.", INVEST OPHTHALMOL VIS SCI, (2003), vol. 44, pages 974 - 979 | - VAN DER HEIJDE DM; VAN LEEUWEN MA; VAN RIEL PL; VAN DE PUTTE LB, "Radiographic progression on radiographs of hands and feet during the first 3 years of rheumatoid arthritis measured according to sharp's method (van der Heijde modification).", J RHEUMATOL, (1995), vol. 22, pages 1792 - 1796 | - SAKAE TANAKA, "Signaling axis in osteoclast biology and therapeutic targeting in the RANKL/RANK/OPG System.", AM. J. NEPHROL., (2007), vol. 27, pages 466 - 478 | - SATO K; TAKAYANAGI H., "Osteoclasts, rheumatoid arthritis and osteoimmunology", CURR OPIN RHEUMATOL, (2006), vol. 18, pages 419 - 426 | - PASSANITI A; TAYLOR RM; PILI R; GUO Y; LONG PV; HANEY JA; PAULY RR; GRANT DS; MARTIN GR, "A simple, quantitative method for assessing angiogenesis and antiangiogenic agents using reconstituted basement membrane, heparin, and fibroblast growth factor.", LAB INVEST, (1992), vol. 67, pages 519 - 528, XP009047492 |