EP2517557 - Animal models and therapeutic molecules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2023 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kymab Limited The Bennet Building (B930) Babraham Research Campus Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB | [2023/31] |
Former [2015/22] | For all designated states Kymab Limited The Bennet Building (B930) Babraham Research Campus Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB | ||
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Kymab Limited Meditrina (B260) Babraham Research Campus Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB22 3AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bradley, Allan c/o Kymab Limited The Bennet Building (930) Babraham Research Campus Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB | 02 /
Lee, E-Chiang c/o Kymab Limited The Bennet Building (930) Babraham Research Campus Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB | 03 /
Liang, Qi c/o Kymab Limited The Bennet Building Babraham Research Campus Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB | 04 /
Wang, Wei c/o Kymab Limited The Bennet Building Babraham Research Campus Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB | [2016/15] |
Former [2014/12] | 01 /
Bradley, Allan c/o Kymab Limited Meditrina (B260) Babraham Research Campus Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB22 3AT / GB | ||
02 /
Lee, E-Chiang c/o Kymab Limited Meditrina (B260) Babraham Research Campus Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB22 3AT / GB | |||
03 /
Liang, Qi c/o Kymab Limited Meditrina (B260) Babraham Research Campus Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB22 3AT / GB | |||
04 /
Wang, Wei c/o Kymab Limited Meditrina (B260) Babraham Research Campus Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB22 3AT / GB | |||
Former [2012/44] | 01 /
Bradley, Allan c/o Genome Research Limited Gibbs Building, 215 Euston Road London, Greater London NW1 2BE / GB | ||
02 /
Lee, E-Chiang c/o Genome Research Limited Gibbs Building, 215 Euston Road London, Greater London NW1 2BE / GB | |||
03 /
Liang, Qi c/o Genome Research Limited Gibbs Building, 215 Euston Road London, Greater London NW1 2BE / GB | |||
04 /
Wang, Wei c/o Genome Research Limited Gibbs Building, 215 Euston Road London, Greater London NW1 2BE / GB | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [2023/31] |
Former [2012/44] | Stephen, Robert John Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 12171793.8 | 07.07.2010 | [2012/44] | Priority number, date | GB20090011846 | 08.07.2009 Original published format: GB 0911846 | US20090223960P | 08.07.2009 Original published format: US 223960 P | GB20090013102 | 28.07.2009 Original published format: GB 0913102 | US20100355666P | 17.06.2010 Original published format: US 355666 P | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2517557 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2517557 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2517557 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2517557 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, C07K16/00, C07K16/46, C12N15/85 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
A01K67/0278 (EP,KR,US);
A01K67/027 (KR);
A01K67/0271 (US);
A01K67/0275 (US);
A01K67/0276 (US);
A61K39/107 (US);
A61K39/35 (US);
A61P37/02 (EP);
C07K16/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/1203 (US);
C07K16/1239 (US);
C07K16/18 (US);
C07K16/462 (EP,KR,US);
C12N15/8509 (EP,KR,US);
A01K2207/15 (EP,KR,US);
A01K2217/05 (US);
A01K2217/052 (EP,KR,US);
A01K2217/072 (US);
A01K2217/075 (US);
A01K2217/15 (US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,KR,US);
A01K2267/01 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
C07K2317/14 (US);
C07K2317/21 (US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/51 (US);
C07K2317/515 (US);
C07K2317/52 (US);
C07K2317/56 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/567 (US);
C07K2317/76 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2012/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Tiermodelle und therapeutische Moleküle | [2012/44] | English: | Animal models and therapeutic molecules | [2012/44] | French: | Modèles animaux et molécules thérapeutiques | [2012/44] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2014 | Observations by third parties | 05.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2015 | Observations by third parties | 22.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2015 | Observations by third parties | 11.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 24.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10734546.4 / EP2421357 | Divisional application(s) | EP14170196.1 / EP2798950 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100734546) is 12.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.01.2017
31.10.2022
WITHDRAWN Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown NY 10591 / US Opponent's representative J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/49] |
Former [2017/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.01.2017
20.01.2017
ADMISSIBLE Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown NY 10591 / US Opponent's representative J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2017/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.01.2017
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown NY 10591 / US Opponent's representative Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | 17.02.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.06.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.07.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.08.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 20.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.12.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.06.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 26.07.2018 | Appeal received No. T1990/18 | 05.11.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 26.04.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 05.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2010 | AL | 13.04.2016 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BE | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | ES | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | HR | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | IT | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | MK | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | SM | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | LU | 07.07.2016 | NO | 13.07.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 07.07.2010 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BG | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.07.2010 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.07.2010 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.07.2010 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
LU | 07.07.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
ES | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
NO | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO02066630 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1,3-6,16-19,22-26 * page 9, line 15 - page 14, line 23; example 3; claims 1-50 * [Y] 2,7-13; | [A]WO03047336 (ABGENIX INC [US], et al) [A] 1-27* claims 1-81 *; | [XY]US2006015957 (LONBERG NILS [US], et al) [X] 14,17-20,22-27 * paragraph [0249] - paragraph [0368]; claims 17-32 * [Y] 2,7,11-13; | [Y]WO2009080254 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [Y] 8-10 * page 10 - page 11; figure 4 *; | [E]WO2011163314 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [E] 15 * page 11 - page 12 * | by applicant | US5859307 | WO9929837 | WO0104288 | WO2007117410 | WO2010039900 | - ADAMS DJ; QUAIL MA; COX T; VAN DER WEYDEN L; GORICK BD; SU Q; CHAN WI; DAVIES R; BONFIELD JK; LAW F, "A genome-wide, end-sequenced 129Sv BAC library resource for targeting vector construction", GENOMICS, (20051027), vol. 86, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ygeno.2005.08.003, pages 753 - 8, XP005265840 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ygeno.2005.08.003 | - OSOEGAWA K ET AL., GENOME RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 11, pages 483 - 496 | - PASQUALINI; ARAP, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (2004), vol. 101, pages 257 - 259 | - BARRETT, M.T.; SCHEFFER, A.; BEN-DOR, A.; SAMPAS, N.; LIPSON, D.; KINCAID, R.; TSANG, P.; CURRY, B.; BAIRD, K.; MELTZER, P.S. ET A, "Comparative genomic hybridization using oligonucleotide microarrays and total genomic DNA", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2004), vol. 101, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0407979101, pages 17765 - 17770, XP002630628 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0407979101 | - RAMIREZ-SOLIS R; LIU P; BRADLEY A, "Chromosome engineering in mice", NATURE, (1995), vol. 378, no. 6558, doi:doi:10.1038/378720a0, pages 720 - 4, XP001026456 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/378720a0 | - PROSSER, H.M.; RZADZINSKA, A.K.; STEEL, K.P.; BRADLEY, A., "Mosaic complementation demonstrates a regulatory role for myosin Vila in actin dynamics of stereocilia", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, (2008), vol. 28, pages 1702 - 1712 | - RAMIREZ-SOLIS, R.; DAVIS, A.C.; BRADLEY, A., "Gene targeting in embryonic stem cells", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1993), vol. 225, doi:doi:10.1016/0076-6879(93)25054-6, pages 855 - 878, XP000918540 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(93)25054-6 | - CHAN, W.; COSTANTINO, N.; LI, R.; LEE, S.C.; SU, Q.; MELVIN, D.; COURT, D.L.; LIU, P., "A recombineering based approach for high-throughput conditional knockout targeting vector construction", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2007), vol. 35, page E64 | - CHUNG, Y.J.; JONKERS, J.; KITSON, H.; FIEGLER, H.; HUMPHRAY, S.; SCOTT, C.; HUNT, S.; YU, Y.; NISHIJIMA, I.; VELDS, A. ET AL., "A whole-genome mouse BAC microarray with 1-Mb resolution for analysis of DNA copy number changes by array comparative genomic hybridization", GENOME RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 14, pages 188 - 196 | - LIANG, Q.; CONTE, N.; SKARNES, W.C.; BRADLEY, A., "Extensive genomic copy number variation in embryonic stem cells", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2008), vol. 105, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0805638105, pages 17453 - 17456, XP055303731 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0805638105 | - ZHENG ET AL., NAR, (1999), vol. 27, no. 11, pages 2354 - 2360 | - SCHLAKE, T.; J. BODE, "Use of mutated FLP-recognition-target-(FRT-)sites for the exchange of expression cassettes at defined chromosomal loci", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 33, doi:doi:10.1021/bi00209a003, pages 12746 - 12751, XP000616165 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00209a003 | - WALLACE, H.A.C. ET AL., "Manipulating the mouse genome to engineering precise functional syntenic replacements with human sequence", CELL, (2007), vol. 128, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cell.2006.11.044, pages 197 - 209, XP002481713 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2006.11.044 | - PROSSER, H.M. ET AL., "Mosaic complementation demonstrates a regulatory role for myosin Vlla in actin dynamics of Stereocilia", MOL. CELL. BIOL., (2008), vol. 28, pages 1702 - 12 | other | US6596541 | Opposition | WO02066630 | US6596541 | US7294754 | WO2011163314 | EP2480676 | - MURPHY et al., "VelocImmune: Immunoglobulin Variable Region Humanized Mice", MURPHY et al., Melvyn Little, Recombinant Antibodies for Immunotherapy, (20090000), pages 100 - 107, XP055343725 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1017/CBO9780511596773.011 | - STEVENS et al., "VelocImmune - A novel platform", Pharma Focus Asia, (20080000), vol. 8, pages 72 - 74, XP003035947 | - MACDONALD et al., "VELOCIGENE TECHNOLOGY EXTENDED TO HUMANIZATION OF SEVERAL MEGABASES OF COMPLEX GENE LOCI", 1st International MUGEN conference on Animal Models for Human Immunological Disease, Athens, Greece, (20160910), XP055304452 | - MACDONALD et al., "VELOCIGENE TECHNOLOGY EXTENDED TO HUMANIZATION OF SEVERAL MEGABASES OF COMPLEX GENE LOCI", 1st International MUGEN conference on Animal Models for Human Immunological Disease, Athens, Greece, (20060000), XP055343742 | - STEVENS et al., "VelocImmune: Humanization of immunoglobulin loci using VelociGene® technology", 1st International MUGEN conference on Animal Models for Human Immunological Disease, Athens, Greece, (20160910), XP055343747 | - MACDONALD et al., "Precise and in situ genetic humanization of 6 Mb of mouse immunoglobulin genes", PNAS USA, (20140000), vol. 111, no. 14, pages 5147 - 5152, XP055126064 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1323896111 | - MURPHY et al., "Mice with megabase humanization of their immunoglobulin genes generate antibodies as efficiently as normal mice", PNAS USA, (20140000), vol. 111, no. 14, pages 5153 - 5158, XP055162338 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1324022111 | - "ES cell line", University of California website, URL: http://www.research.uci.edu/facilities-services/tmf/presentations/ Mouse_ES_CellLine.pdf, XP055343751 | - BECK et al., "Genealogies of mouse inbred strains", Nature Genetics, (20070000), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 23 - 25, XP055343752 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/71641 | - BECK et al., "Information supplementary to "Genealogies of mouse inbred strains"", Nature Genet, (20000000), vol. 24, no. 1, pages s1 - s4, XP055344285 | - BECK et al., "Supplementary Chart for "Genealogies of mouse inbred strains"", Nature Genet, (20000000), vol. 24, no. 1, page s1, XP055344289 | - SIMPSON et al., "Genetic variation among 129 substrains and its importance for targeted mutagenesis in mice", Nature Genetics, (19970000), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 19 - 27, XP008033035 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng0597-19 | - CARTER et al., "Standardized Nomenclature for Inbred Strains of Mice", Cancer Research, (19520000), vol. 12, no. 8, pages 602 - 613, XP055344294 | - EPPIG et al., "Guidelines for Nomenclature of Mouse and Rat Strains", Mouse Genome Informatics, (20111000), XP055344298 | - FESTING et al., "Revised nomenclature for strain 129 mice", Mammalian Genome, (19990000), vol. 10, no. 8, page 836, XP055344303 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s003359901099 | - CHIA et al., "The origins and uses of mouse outbred stocks", Nature Genetics, (20050000), vol. 37, no. 11, pages 1181 - 1186, XP055344306 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng1665 | - RETTER et al., "Sequence and Characterization of the lg Heavy Chain Constant and Partial variable Region of the Mouse Strain 129S1", J. Immunol., (20070000), vol. 179, no. 4, pages 2419 - 2427, XP055268136 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.179.4.2419 | - MARTINEZ et al., "The Mouse (Mus musculus) Immunoglobulin Kappa Variable (IGKV) Genes and Joining (IGKJ) Segments", Exp. Clin. Immunogenet ., (19980000), vol. 15, pages 184 - 193, XP055344312 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000019069 | - STEVENS et al., "VelocImmune - A novel platform", Pharma Focus Asia, (20080000), vol. 8, pages 72 - 74 | - MACDONALD et al., "Precise and in situ genetic humanization of 6 Mb of mouse immunoglobulin genes", PNAS USA, (20140000), vol. 111, no. 14, pages 5147 - 5152 | - MURPHY et al., "Mice with megabase humanization of their immunoglobulin genes generate antibodies as efficiently as normal mice", PNAS USA, (20140000), vol. 111, no. 14, pages 5153 - 5158 | - "ES cell line", University of California website, URL: http://www.research.uci.edu/facilities-services/tmf/presentations/ Mouse_ES_CellLine.pdf | - BECK et al., "Genealogies of mouse inbred strains", Nature Genetics, (20070000), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 23 - 25 | - BECK et al., "Information supplementary to "Genealogies of mouse inbred strains"", Nature Genet, (20000000), vol. 24, no. 1, pages s1 - s4 | - BECK et al., "Supplementary Chart for "Genealogies of mouse inbred strains"", Nature Genet, (20000000), vol. 24, no. 1, page s1 | - SIMPSON et al., "Genetic variation among 129 substrains and its importance for targeted mutagenesis in mice", Nature Genetics, (19970000), vol. 16, no. 1, pages 19 - 27 | - CARTER et al., "Standardized Nomenclature for Inbred Strains of Mice", Cancer Research, (19520000), vol. 12, no. 8, pages 602 - 613 | - FESTING et al., "Revised nomenclature for strain 129 mice", Mammalian Genome, (19990000), vol. 10, no. 8, page 836 | - CHIA et al., "The origins and uses of mouse outbred stocks", Nature Genetics, (20050000), vol. 37, no. 11, pages 1181 - 1186 | - RETTER et al., "Sequence and Characterization of the lg Heavy Chain Constant and Partial variable Region of the Mouse Strain 129S1", J. Immunol., (20070000), vol. 179, no. 4, pages 2419 - 2427 | - MARTINEZ et al., "The Mouse (Mus musculus) Immunoglobulin Kappa Variable (IGKV) Genes and Joining (IGKJ) Segments", Exp. Clin. Immunogenet ., (19980000), vol. 15, pages 184 - 193 |