EP2674584 - Use of an oxidation catalyst for preventing the contamination of an SCR catalyst with platinum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/51] | Method for preventing the contamination of an SCR catalyst with platinum | ||
[2020/14] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2013/51] | For all designated states Umicore AG & Co. KG Rodenbacher Chaussee 4 63457 Hanau-Wolfgang / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUETZE, Frank-Walter Sponackerweg 2 63808 Haibach / DE | 02 /
PFEIFER, Marcus Wittkuller Strasse 154a 42719 Solingen / DE | 03 /
SCHIFFER, Michael In den Tuerkischen Gaerten 18 63450 Hanau / DE | 04 /
SYMALLA, Martin Roemerstrasse 45 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
HENGST, Christoph Alte Hauptstrasse 13 35510 Butzbach / DE | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2020/18] | Application number, filing date | 12171948.8 | 14.06.2012 | [2013/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2674584 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2674584 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2674584 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/00, B01J23/42, B01J23/52, B01D53/94, B01J29/072, F01N3/20 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
B01D53/9418 (EP,US);
B01D53/944 (EP,US);
B01D53/9477 (EP,US);
B01J23/42 (EP,US);
B01J23/52 (EP,US);
B01J29/072 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1023 (EP,US);
B01D2255/106 (EP,US);
B01D2255/50 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/51] | F01N3/20, F01N3/10, C01B21/26, B01D53/94, B01J23/42, B01J23/44, B01J23/52, B01J35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] |
Former [2013/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwendung eines Oxidationskatalysators zur Verhinderung der Kontamination eines SCR-Katalysators mit Platin | [2020/14] | English: | Use of an oxidation catalyst for preventing the contamination of an SCR catalyst with platinum | [2020/14] | French: | Utilisation d'un catalyseur à oxydation pour la prévention de la contamination d'un catalyseur SCR avec platine | [2020/14] |
Former [2013/51] | Verfahren zur Verhinderung der Kontamination eines SCR-Katalysators mit Platin | ||
Former [2013/51] | Method for preventing the contamination of an SCR catalyst with platinum | ||
Former [2013/51] | Procédé de prévention de la contamination d'un catalyseur SCR avec platine | Examination procedure | 18.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 05.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.05.2018
11.09.2019
WITHDRAWN JOHNSON MATTHEY PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Nunn, Andrew Dominic Johnson Matthey PLC Gate 20 Orchard Road Royston, Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB | [2019/42] |
Former [2019/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.05.2018
15.05.2018
ADMISSIBLE JOHNSON MATTHEY PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Nunn, Andrew Dominic Johnson Matthey PLC Gate 20 Orchard Road Royston, Hertfordshire SG8 5HE / GB | ||
Former [2018/25] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.05.2018
15.05.2018
ADMISSIBLE JOHNSON MATTHEY PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB Opponent's representative Turberville, Simon Johnson Matthey PLC Gate 20 Orchard Road Royston, Herts SG8 5HE / GB | 25.05.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.09.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.11.2019 | 11.11.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.11.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.03.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2012 | AL | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | DK | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | ES | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | MK | 09.08.2017 | MT | 09.08.2017 | NL | 09.08.2017 | PL | 09.08.2017 | PT | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | RS | 09.08.2017 | SE | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | SM | 09.08.2017 | TR | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | NO | 09.11.2017 | GR | 10.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | AT | 14.06.2018 | IE | 14.06.2018 | LU | 14.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 14.06.2012 | |
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
AT | 14.06.2018 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 14.06.2012 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
AT | 14.06.2018 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
AT | 14.06.2018 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
AT | 14.06.2018 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
IE | 14.06.2018 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
LU | 14.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
ES | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 09.08.2017 | |
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | |
NO | 09.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2730189 (HERMANN HOLZMANN) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008117941 (HEESUNG CATALYSTS CORP [KR], et al)[A] 1; | [A]JP2010211946 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]US2011138777 (JEN HUNGWEN [US], et al) [AD] 1; | [AD]US2011206584 (DOBSON DOUGLAS ALLEN [US], et al) [AD] 1 | Examination | WO2013088133 | by applicant | WO9939809 | EP1938893 | WO2009140989 | US2011138777 | US2011206584 | Opposition | EP1925362 | WO2009136206 | US2009288402 | US2010183490 | US2010290964 | US2011143921 | US2011206584 | WO2013050784 | WO2013088133 |