EP2535236 - Rail vehicle car with wheelchair area and rail vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Opposition rejected | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Holdings 48 rue Albert Dhalenne 93400 Saint-Ouen-sur-Seine / FR | [2022/27] |
Former [2017/34] | For all designated states Bombardier Transportation GmbH Eichhornstraße 3 10785 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2012/51] | For all designated states Bombardier Transportation GmbH Schoeneberger Ufer 1 10785 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Shunan Zähringerstraße 13 10707 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Hartung, Heiko Rheingoldstraße 42 16321 Bernau bei Berlin / DE | 03 /
Scharf, Steffen Wichgrafstraße 18A 14482 Potsdam / DE | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2019/14] |
Former [2012/51] | Zimmermann & Partner Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12172051.0 | 14.06.2012 | [2012/51] | Priority number, date | DE20111051082 | 15.06.2011 Original published format: DE102011051082 | [2012/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2535236 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2535236 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2535236 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B61D1/00, B61D35/00, B61D37/00 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
B61D1/00 (EP);
B61D35/005 (EP);
B61D37/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/14] |
Former [2012/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Schienenfahrzeugwagen mit Rollstuhlbereich sowie Schienenfahrzeug | [2012/51] | English: | Rail vehicle car with wheelchair area and rail vehicle | [2012/51] | French: | Chariot de véhicule sur rails doté d'une zone de fauteuil roulant ainsi que véhicule sur rails | [2012/51] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 12.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.12.2019
ADMISSIBLE Stadler Rail AG Ernst-Stadler-Strasse 1 9565 Bussnang / CH Opponent's representative Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2020/05] | 21.01.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.06.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.01.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.01.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 19.03.2024 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2024/35] | Appeal following opposition | 14.02.2022 | Appeal received No. T0405/22 | 14.02.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 19.03.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2012 | AL | 03.04.2019 | CY | 03.04.2019 | CZ | 03.04.2019 | DK | 03.04.2019 | EE | 03.04.2019 | FI | 03.04.2019 | HR | 03.04.2019 | LT | 03.04.2019 | LV | 03.04.2019 | MC | 03.04.2019 | MK | 03.04.2019 | MT | 03.04.2019 | NL | 03.04.2019 | PL | 03.04.2019 | RO | 03.04.2019 | RS | 03.04.2019 | SE | 03.04.2019 | SI | 03.04.2019 | SK | 03.04.2019 | SM | 03.04.2019 | TR | 03.04.2019 | IE | 14.06.2019 | LU | 14.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | BG | 03.07.2019 | GB | 03.07.2019 | NO | 03.07.2019 | GR | 04.07.2019 | IS | 03.08.2019 | PT | 03.08.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.06.2012 | |
AL | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
MT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.06.2019 | ||
LU | 14.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GB | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.06.2012 | |
AL | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.06.2019 | ||
LU | 14.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GB | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.06.2019 | ||
LU | 14.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GB | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.06.2019 | ||
LU | 14.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GB | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
GB | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IE | 14.06.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RO | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
DK | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 03.04.2019 | |
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
SE | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 03.04.2019 | |
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 03.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE4232767 (AMMENDORF WAGGONBAU [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [XYI]DE4442368 (TALBOT GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,14 * column 3, lines 18-27; figure - * * column 1, lines 56-63 * [Y] 3,12 [I] 6-11,13; | [XI]JP2000229567 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1,2,5,7,9,13,14 * paragraph [0027]; figures 3a, 3b * [I] 3,4,6,8,10-12; | [XI]JP2003089355 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-3,12-14 * abstract * [I] 4-11; | [Y]DE102007055406 (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3,12 * abstract *; | [A]DE102007055372 (BOMBARDIER TRANSP GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,3,12* figure . * | by applicant | DE4232767 | Opposition | US1523642 | US4161914 | JP2003089355 | US2003056686 | DE102006042070 | EP2060469 | EP2060470 | - "L 64 ''TSI-PRM", Amtsblatt der Europäischen Union, (20080307), XP055667107 | - "59 Bombardier-Doppelstockzüge für die SBB", Eisenbahn-Revue, (20100600), pages 273 - 279, XP055667109 | - J. JANICKI et al., "Schienenfahrzeugtechnik", Schienenfahrzeugtechnik, Heidelberg, (20080000), pages 352,358,360 - 361, XP055539693 | - "Speisewagen", (20191114), Wikipedia, URL: https://de.wikipedia.org/wiki/Speisewagen#Bistro Caf%C3%A9, XP055667110 | - M.BUHLE et al., "Das Eisenbahn- und Verkehrswesen auf der Weltausstellung in St. Louis 1904", Polytechnisches Journal, (19050000), vol. 320, pages 529 - 533, XP055667114 | - KD. BODACK, "Der Inter-Regio der Deutschen Bahn", Eisenbahn-Revue International, (19990300), XP055667116 | - H. HUBLI et al., "Gelenktriebwagen RABe 526 für die Regionalverkehr Mittel- land AG", Eisen- bahn-Revue, (20031100), pages 498 - 503, XP055667118 | - A. BROCKMEYER et al., "Der ICT2-Evolution statt Revolution im Intercity- Verkehr", Eisenbahn-Revue, (20031100), pages 485 - 487, XP055667120 |