EP2581610 - Mechanical assembly for the connection between two modular elements of telescopic poles for practicing sport, spare time activities and the like and telescopic poles for the practicing sport, spare time activities and the like provided with such a mechanical assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fizan S.r.l. Via Borgo Tocchi, 18 36027 Rosa (VI) / IT | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zaltron, Andrea c/o FIZAN S.r.l. Via Borgo Tocchi, 18 I-36027 Rosà (VI) / IT | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Contadin, Giorgio, et al Praxi Intellectual Property S.p.A. Via N. Tommaseo, 76/D 35131 Padova / IT | [2013/16] | Application number, filing date | 12172609.5 | 19.06.2012 | [2013/16] | Priority number, date | IT2011VI00272 | 12.10.2011 Original published format: IT VI20110272 | [2013/16] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2581610 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2581610 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A63C11/22, // F16B7/14 | [2015/13] | CPC: |
F16B7/149 (EP,US);
A63C11/221 (EP,US);
F16B7/1418 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32467 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/16] | F16B7/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2013/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Mechanische Baugruppe zur Verbindung zwischen zwei modularen Elementen teleskopischer Stangen zum Praktizieren von Sport, Freizeitaktivitäten und dergleichen, und teleskopische Stangen zum Praktizieren von Sport, Freizeitaktivitäten und dergleichen mit einer solchen mechanischen Baugruppe | [2013/16] | English: | Mechanical assembly for the connection between two modular elements of telescopic poles for practicing sport, spare time activities and the like and telescopic poles for the practicing sport, spare time activities and the like provided with such a mechanical assembly | [2013/16] | French: | Ensemble mécanique pour le raccordement entre deux éléments modulaires de montants télescopiques pour pratiquer un sport, des activités de temps libre et similaires et montants télescopiques pour la pratique du sport, des activités de temps libre et analogues équipés d'un tel ensemble mécanique | [2013/16] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 10.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2012 | AL | 12.08.2015 | AT | 12.08.2015 | BE | 12.08.2015 | BG | 12.08.2015 | CY | 12.08.2015 | CZ | 12.08.2015 | DK | 12.08.2015 | EE | 12.08.2015 | ES | 12.08.2015 | FI | 12.08.2015 | HR | 12.08.2015 | LT | 12.08.2015 | LV | 12.08.2015 | MC | 12.08.2015 | MK | 12.08.2015 | NL | 12.08.2015 | PL | 12.08.2015 | RO | 12.08.2015 | RS | 12.08.2015 | SE | 12.08.2015 | SI | 12.08.2015 | SK | 12.08.2015 | SM | 12.08.2015 | TR | 12.08.2015 | NO | 12.11.2015 | GR | 13.11.2015 | IS | 12.12.2015 | PT | 14.12.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 19.06.2012 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
BG | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 19.06.2012 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.06.2012 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
TR | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.06.2012 | |
AT | 12.08.2015 | ||
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CY | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
MK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
SM | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
MC | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
BE | 12.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SI | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RO | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
SK | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
CZ | 12.08.2015 | ||
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
EE | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
DK | 12.08.2015 | ||
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NL | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 12.08.2015 | |
ES | 12.08.2015 | ||
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 12.08.2015 | |
FI | 12.08.2015 | ||
HR | 12.08.2015 | ||
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
PL | 12.08.2015 | ||
RS | 12.08.2015 | ||
SE | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
IS | 12.12.2015 | ||
PT | 14.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 12.08.2015 | |
LT | 12.08.2015 | ||
LV | 12.08.2015 | ||
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
GR | 13.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 12.08.2015 | |
NO | 12.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 12.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR984264 (LOUISE BALLOIS) [X] 1-6,8,11,12,15 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2009008213 (TIMS PHILIP [GB], et al) [X] 1-5,15 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * claim 39 *; | [X]FR2600197 (DEN BERGH STEPHANE VAN [FR]) [X] 1 * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2011013980 (BENSUSSAN BERNARD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2409009 (SHIN TAI SPURT WATER GARDEN [TW]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR984264 | US2009008213 | FR2600197 |