EP2538757 - Illumination apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nanahara, Atuo c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F, Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Matsuda, Shinji c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F, Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12172942.0 | 21.06.2012 | [2012/52] | Priority number, date | JP20110138512 | 22.06.2011 Original published format: JP 2011138512 | [2012/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2538757 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
H05B47/125 (EP,US);
Y02B20/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung | [2012/52] | English: | Illumination apparatus | [2012/52] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage | [2012/52] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 14.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 24.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011115910 (BRACKNEY LARRY J [US]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,3 *; | [X]WO2010100586 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]EP1408276 (KLUTH MANFRED [DE]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]WO03098977 (CELLUX AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]WO2010010493 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 8, line 14 - page 9, line 18 * | by applicant | JP2002289377 |