EP2537979 - METHOD OF PRODUCING CELLULOSE PULP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/52] | Method of producing cellulose pulp | ||
[2023/29] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andritz Oy Tammasaarenkatu 1 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2017/46] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Metsä Fibre Oy P.O. Box 30 02020 Metsä / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURUNEN, Esko c/o Metsä Fibre Oy P.O Box 30 02020 METSÄ / FI | 02 /
KOVASIN, Kari c/o Metsä Fibre Oy P.O. Box 30 02020 METSÄ / FI | [2024/13] |
Former [2023/29] | 01 /
TURUNEN, Esko c/o Metsä Fibre Oy P.O Box 30 02020 METSÄ / FI | ||
02 /
KOVASIN, Kari c/o Metsä Fibre Oy P.O. Box 30 02020 METSÄ / FI | |||
Former [2012/52] | 01 /
Turunen, Esko c/o Metsä Fibre Oy P.O Box 30 02020 METSÄ / FI | ||
02 /
Kovasin, Kari c/o Metsä Fibre Oy P.O. Box 30 02020 METSÄ / FI | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2024/13] |
Former [2014/27] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2012/52] | Sundman, Patrik Christoffer Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 12172946.1 | 21.06.2012 | [2012/52] | Priority number, date | FI20110005659 | 23.06.2011 Original published format: FI 20115659 | [2012/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2537979 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2537979 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D21C1/06 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
D21C1/06 (EP,FI,RU,US);
D21C3/02 (EP,FI,US);
D21C3/222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] |
Former [2012/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CELLULOSEPULPE | [2023/29] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING CELLULOSE PULP | [2023/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PULPE DE CELLULOSE | [2023/29] |
Former [2012/52] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Cellulosepulpe | ||
Former [2012/52] | Method of producing cellulose pulp | ||
Former [2012/52] | Procédé de production de pulpe de cellulose | Examination procedure | 25.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 07.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3661698 (CLAYTON DAVID W, et al); | [A]EP0903436 (KVAERNER PULPING TECH [SE]); | [X]WO9914423 (KVAERNER PULPING TECH [SE], et al); | [A]WO9945191 (AHLSTROM MACHINERY INC [US]); | [A]US6153052 (LUTHE CORINNE ELIZABETH [CA], et al); | [A]WO2005064075 (METSO PAPER INC [FI], et al); | [A]US2007240837 (SHIN NAM HEE [US], et al); | [XD]US2009126883 (JIANG JIANER [US]); | [X]WO2010115090 (UNIV AUBURN [US], et al) | by applicant | WO03057979 | EP1702101 | US2009126883 |