EP2540344 - Dual patient controllers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NUVECTRA CORPORATION 5830 Granite Parkway, Suite 1100 Plano, Texas 75024 / US | [2016/24] |
Former [2016/23] | For all designated states NUVECTRA CORPORATION 5830 Granite Parkway, Suite 100 Plano, Texas 75024 / US | ||
Former [2016/18] | For all designated states QIG Group, LLC 10000 Wehrle Drive Clarence, New York 14031 / US | ||
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states Greatbatch Ltd. 10000 Wehrle Drive Clarence, New York 14031 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilder, Steven E. 2618 Silver Fox Trail Ashland, OH Ohio 44805 / US | 02 /
Labbe, Michael S. 9324 Wallingford Drive Twinsburg, OH Ohio 44087 / US | 03 /
Gagnon, Jeff 11261 Oakridge Circle Champlin, MN Minnesota 55316 / US | 04 /
Cottrill, Ben 360 Dalwood Drive Cleveland, OH Ohio 44110 / US | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 12173004.8 | 21.06.2012 | [2013/01] | Priority number, date | US201113170775 | 28.06.2011 Original published format: US201113170775 | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2540344 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/378, A61N1/372 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
A61N1/37247 (EP,US);
A61N1/37229 (US);
A61N1/3787 (EP,US);
A61N1/36071 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Doppelpatientenüberwacher | [2013/01] | English: | Dual patient controllers | [2013/01] | French: | Contrôleurs de patient double | [2013/01] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 07.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 10.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009134474 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * page 10, line 9 - page 11, line 25 * [I] 2-11,13-15; | [I]US2010305663 (AGHASSIAN DANIEL [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US6393325 (MANN CARLA M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US6516227 (MEADOWS PAUL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US2009118796 (CHEN JOEY [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * |