EP2696201 - Sensors for selective electrochemical detection of reactive oxygen species and reactive nitrogen species in fluid media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albert-Ludwigs-Universität Freiburg Fahnenbergplatz 79085 Freiburg / DE | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aravindalochanan, Kuppusamy Hofackerstrasse 92 79110 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
Kieninger, Jochen Schlesierstr. 2 79117 Freiburg / DE | 03 /
Flamm, Hubert Ahlenbachweg 21b 79286 Glottertal / DE | 04 /
Urban, Gerald. A Kartäuserstrasse 118 D 79102 Freiburg / DE | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12173383.6 | 25.06.2012 | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2696201 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
C12Q1/001 (EP);
C12Q1/005 (EP);
G01N33/0037 (EP);
G01N33/5438 (EP);
Y02A50/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sensoren für selektive elektrochemische Erkennung reaktiver Sauerstoffspezies und reaktiver Stickstoffspezies in Flüssigmedien | [2014/01] | English: | Sensors for selective electrochemical detection of reactive oxygen species and reactive nitrogen species in fluid media | [2014/01] | French: | Capteurs de détection électrochimique sélective d'espèces oxygénées et azotées réactives dans des milieux fluides | [2014/01] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 23.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - WANSIK CHA ET AL, "Patterned Electrode-Based Amperometric Gas Sensor for Direct Nitric Oxide Detection within Microfluidic Devices", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (20100415), vol. 82, no. 8, doi:10.1021/ac100085w, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 3300 - 3305, XP055041576 [X] 1 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac100085w | [ID] - ARAVINDALOCHANAN K ET AL, "Simulation and design of a nitric oxide sensor array for cell cultures", SENSORS, 2009 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091025), ISBN 978-1-4244-4548-6, pages 325 - 328, XP031618557 [ID] 1-15 * the whole document * | [ID] - ARAVINDALOCHANAN K ET AL, "Optimising a Nitric oxide sensing technique for hypoxic tumor cell cultures", SOLID-STATE SENSORS, ACTUATORS AND MICROSYSTEMS CONFERENCE, 2009. TRANSDUCERS 2009. INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090621), ISBN 978-1-4244-4190-7, pages 1003 - 1006, XP031545868 [ID] 1-15 * the whole document * | [I] - SEBASTIÁN A. SUÁREZ ET AL, "A Surface Effect Allows HNO/NO Discrimination by a Cobalt Porphyrin Bound to Gold", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20100802), vol. 49, no. 15, doi:10.1021/ic1007022, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 6955 - 6966, XP055041559 [I] 1-15 * page 6966, column 1 - column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic1007022 | [A] - YOUNGMI LEE ET AL, "Simultaneous Electrochemical Detection of Nitric Oxide and Carbon Monoxide Generated from Mouse Kidney Organ Tissue", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (20071015), vol. 79, no. 20, pages 7669 - 7675, XP055041574 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac2031628 | [A] - A. ZELLER ET AL, "Mechanisms Underlying Activation of Soluble Guanylate Cyclase by the Nitroxyl Donor Angeli's Salt", MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (20090831), vol. 76, no. 5, doi:10.1124/mol.109.059915, ISSN 0026-895X, pages 1115 - 1122, XP055041746 [A] 1-15 * see discussion * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/mol.109.059915 | [A] - SALMON DEBRA J ET AL, "Comparison of HNO detection methods for quantitative results", AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. ABSTRACTS OF PAPER. AT THE NATIONAL MEETING, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20090101), vol. 237, ISSN 0065-7727, page INOR459, XP009163883 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US5603820 | - V. SHAFIROVICH ET AL., PROC. NAT. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, no. 11, pages 7340 - 7325 | - P. A. S. SMITH ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1960), vol. 82, no. 21, pages 5731 - 5740 | - J. M. FUKUTO ET AL., BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1992), vol. 43, no. 3, pages 607 - 613 | - B. SHEN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 44, no. 42, pages 14030 - 14044 | - M. A. MARTI ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2005), vol. 127, no. 12, pages 4680 - 4684 | - K. P. DOBMEIER ET AL., ANAL. CHEM., (2008), vol. 80, no. 4, pages 1247 - 1254 | - J. M. FUKUTO ET AL., CHEM. BIO. CHEM., (2005), vol. 6, no. 4, pages 612 - 619 | - J. C. IRVINE ET AL., TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCIENCES, (2008), vol. 29, no. 12, pages 601 - 608 | - N. PAOLOCCI ET AL., PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, (2007), vol. 113, no. 2, pages 442 - 458 | - E. NOVO ET AL., FIBRINOGENESIS AND TISSUE REPAIR, (2008), vol. 1, page 5 | - H. NAARMANN, Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, (1992), vol. A21, page 429 | - W. J. KORROS ET AL., PURE & APPL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 68, no. 7, pages 1479 - 1489 | - ZHANG ET AL., ELECTROCHEM. COMMUN, (2002), vol. 4, pages 11 - 16 | - K. ARAVINDALOCHANAN ET AL., "Solid-State Sensors, Actuators and Microsystems Conference", TRANSDUCERS 2007. INTERNATIONAL, (2007), pages 1907 - 1910 | - P. EBBESEN, JOURNAL OF ENZYME INHIBITION AND MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2009), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 1 - 39 |