EP2679194 - MEDICAL, IN PARTICULAR DENTAL HANDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/01] | Medical, in particular dental handle | ||
[2023/24] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SM | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W & H Dentalwerk Bürmoos GmbH Ignaz-Glaser-Strasse 53 5111 Bürmoos / AT | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinrich, Christoph Arnsdorfer Straße 8B 5110 Oberndorf / AT | 02 /
Schmiedlechner, Karl Roidhamweg 2 5121 Ostermiething / AT | 03 /
Wagner, Hannes Weiher-Wiesbach-Straße 7 5023 Salzburg / AT | [2014/01] | Application number, filing date | 12173500.5 | 26.06.2012 | [2014/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2679194 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2679194 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61C1/00, A61C1/08, A61C1/12 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
A61C1/00 (EP,US);
H05K5/0026 (US);
A61C1/088 (EP,US);
A61C1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] |
Former [2014/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHES, INSBESONDERE DENTALES, GRIFFSTÜCK | [2023/24] | English: | MEDICAL, IN PARTICULAR DENTAL HANDLE | [2023/24] | French: | PIÈCE DE PRÉHENSION MÉDICALE, EN PARTICULIER DENTAIRE | [2023/24] |
Former [2014/01] | Medizinisches, insbesondere dentales, Griffstück | ||
Former [2014/01] | Medical, in particular dental handle | ||
Former [2014/01] | Pièce de préhension médicale, en particulier dentaire | Examination procedure | 16.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 20.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/14] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19702370 (MORITA MFG [JP]) [A] 1* paragraph [0025]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2005271997 (MIKAMI SHINTAROU [JP], et al) [Y] 4,7 * paragraphs [0051] , [0052]; figure 5 *; | [XY]EP2420198 (ASETRONICS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-15 * paragraphs [0035] - [0038] * * paragraph [0060] * * figures 2,3,6,6a * [Y] 4,7 | Examination | US2006183071 |