EP2518039 - Method for the preparation of therapeutically valuable triphenylbutene derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forendo Pharma Ltd. Itäinen Pitkäkatu 4B 20520 Turku / FI | [2014/47] |
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states Hormos Medical Ltd. Itäinen Pitkäkatu 4 B 20520 Turku / FI | ||
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Hormos Medical Ltd. Itäinen Pitkäkatu 4 B 20520 Turku / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Södervall, Marja Annantie 9 C 7 90560 Oulu / FI | 02 /
Eloranta, Maire Mäntyrinne 18 90240 Oulu / FI | 03 /
Kalapudas, Arja Notkolantie 13 90240 Oulu / FI | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Kolster Oy Ab Iso Roobertinkatu 23 PO Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2013/20] | Kolster Oy Ab P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2012/44] | Syvänen, Ralf Ossian Kolster OY AB Iso Roobertinkatu 23 P.O. Box 148 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 12173502.1 | 13.02.2008 | [2012/44] | Priority number, date | US20070889838P | 14.02.2007 Original published format: US 889838 P | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2518039 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/44] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2518039 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | [2013/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2518039 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2518039 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07C41/01, C07C41/16, C07C41/26, C07C41/30, C07C43/225, C07C43/23, C07C67/31 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
C07C41/30 (EP,US);
C07C43/23 (KR);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07C41/01 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C07C41/26, C07C43/23 (US,EP);
C07C41/30, C07C43/23 (US,EP);
C07C67/31, C07C69/712 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von therapeutisch nützlichen Triphenylbutenderivaten | [2012/44] | English: | Method for the preparation of therapeutically valuable triphenylbutene derivatives | [2012/44] | French: | Procédé de préparation de dérivés de triphénylbuténe d'une valeur thérapeutique | [2012/44] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 24.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08718510.4 / EP2121553 | Divisional application(s) | EP14178678.0 / EP2821385 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.08.2014 | BE | 27.08.2014 | CY | 27.08.2014 | CZ | 27.08.2014 | DK | 27.08.2014 | EE | 27.08.2014 | FI | 27.08.2014 | LT | 27.08.2014 | LV | 27.08.2014 | MC | 27.08.2014 | MT | 27.08.2014 | PL | 27.08.2014 | RO | 27.08.2014 | SK | 27.08.2014 | TR | 27.08.2014 | BG | 27.11.2014 | NO | 27.11.2014 | GR | 28.11.2014 | IS | 27.12.2014 | PT | 29.12.2014 | LU | 13.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 27.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO0136360 (HORMOS MEDICAL OY LTD [FI], et al) [ID] 1-13 * page 51, line 3 - line 8 * * page 49, line 6 - line 11 * * page 46, line 4 - line 10 * | by applicant | WO9607402 | WO9732574 | WO0207718 | WO03103649 | WO0136360 | WO2004108645 | WO2006024689 | WO02090305 | EP0095875 | US6891070 | - KAUFFMAN; BRYANT, DRUG NEWS PERSPECT., (1995), vol. 8, pages 531 - 539 | - KANGAS, CANCER CHEMOTHER. PHARMA- COL., (1990), vol. 27, pages 8 - 12 | - T.W. GREENE; P.G.M. WUTS, Protecting Groups in Organic Synthesis, WILEY INTERSCIENCE, (1999), pages 23 - 200 |