EP2642196 - Luminaire and method of thermal radiation of the luminaire [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Lighting & Technology Corporation 1-201-1, Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa 237-8510 / JP | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nezu, Kenji c/o TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1 Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Shinichiro c/o TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 1-201-1 Funakoshi-cho Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa, 237-8510 / JP | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Bokinge, Ole Awapatent AB Junkersgatan 1 582 35 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 12173788.6 | 27.06.2012 | [2013/39] | Priority number, date | JP20120066217 | 22.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012066217 | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2642196 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/00, F21K99/00, F21V15/01, F21V23/00, H05K1/02 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
H05K1/0204 (EP,US);
F21K9/20 (EP,US);
F21K9/232 (EP,US);
F21K9/238 (EP,US);
F21V23/006 (EP,US);
F21V23/02 (EP);
F21V29/507 (EP,US);
F21V29/508 (EP);
F21V29/70 (EP,US);
F21V3/00 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/15 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Leuchte und Verfahren für die Wärmestrahlung der Leuchte | [2013/39] | English: | Luminaire and method of thermal radiation of the luminaire | [2013/39] | French: | Luminaire et méthode de radiation thermique du luminaire | [2013/39] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2012 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 25.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/07] | 07.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0129966 (CRAY RESEARCH INC [US]); | [Y]DE19506664 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US5661902 (KATCHMAR ROMAN [CA]); | [Y]US6411516 (PALUMBO AARON [US], et al); | [A]DE10214311 (MARCONI COMM GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US2006227254 (KATO KOICHI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2011152038 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2012005239 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY [JP], et al); | EP2469161 [ ] (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY [JP]); | US2012187836 [ ] (HASHIMOTO NAOTAKA [JP], et al) |