EP2541964 - System and method for transmitting and receiving scrambled multimedia content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viaccess Les Collines de l'Arche, Tour Opéra C 92057 Paris La Defense / FR | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubroeucq, Gilles 13 rue de Dionval 28130 Saint Piat / FR | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Colombo, Michel, et al Brevinnov 310 avenue Berthelot 69008 Lyon / FR | [2013/24] |
Former [2013/01] | Colombo, Michel, et al Brevinnov 324, rue Garibaldi 69007 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 12173840.5 | 27.06.2012 | [2013/01] | Priority number, date | FR20110055758 | 28.06.2011 Original published format: FR 1155758 | [2013/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2541964 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2541964 | Date: | 30.08.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/4623, H04N21/266, H04N21/418, G06K19/077, G06K19/073 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
H04N21/266 (EP);
H04N21/418 (EP);
H04N21/4623 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2013/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zum Verschicken und Empfangen von vermischten Multimediainhalten | [2013/01] | English: | System and method for transmitting and receiving scrambled multimedia content | [2013/01] | French: | Systeme et procede d'emission et de reception de contenus multimedias embrouilles | [2013/01] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 17.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.06.2012 | AL | 30.08.2017 | AT | 30.08.2017 | CY | 30.08.2017 | CZ | 30.08.2017 | DK | 30.08.2017 | EE | 30.08.2017 | FI | 30.08.2017 | HR | 30.08.2017 | LT | 30.08.2017 | LV | 30.08.2017 | MC | 30.08.2017 | MK | 30.08.2017 | MT | 30.08.2017 | PT | 30.08.2017 | RO | 30.08.2017 | RS | 30.08.2017 | SE | 30.08.2017 | SI | 30.08.2017 | SK | 30.08.2017 | SM | 30.08.2017 | TR | 30.08.2017 | BG | 30.11.2017 | NO | 30.11.2017 | GR | 01.12.2017 | IS | 30.12.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.06.2012 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CY | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
MK | 30.08.2017 | ||
MT | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 27.06.2012 | |
AT | 30.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
MT | 30.08.2017 | ||
PT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
MT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
TR | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MC | 30.08.2017 | ||
MT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
MT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SI | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
SM | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
EE | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
RO | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
SK | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
CZ | 30.08.2017 | ||
DK | 30.08.2017 | ||
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
LV | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
BG | 30.11.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
GR | 01.12.2017 | ||
IS | 30.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 30.08.2017 | |
FI | 30.08.2017 | ||
HR | 30.08.2017 | ||
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
RS | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
SE | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 30.08.2017 | |
LT | 30.08.2017 | ||
NO | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 30.08.2017 | |
NO | 30.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5847372 (KREFT HANS-DIEDRICH [DE]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 2, line 38 - line 62 *; | [I]US2002023963 (LUU LU V [US]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015] * * figures 4,6 *; | [I]NL9301540 (NEDAP NV) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [I]KR101017425B (LIM HOE JIN [KR], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1,6 *; | [A]WO2008025900 (VIACESS [FR], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 25 - page 11, line 2 * | Examination | US6922780 |