EP2546599 - Deflectometric assembly for surface inspection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Göpel electronic GmbH Göschwitzer Strasse 58/60 07745 Jena / DE | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schambach, Jörg Wiesenweg 52 07639 Bad Klosterlausnitz / DE | 02 /
Türk, Andreas Schleidenstrasse 4 07745 Jena / DE | 03 /
Hieronymus, Robert Fritz-Ritter-Strasse 16 07747 Jena / DE | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Schaller, Renate, et al Gleim Petri Oehmke Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Schaller, Renate, et al Patentanwälte Oehmke & Kollegen Neugasse 13 07743 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 12174033.6 | 28.06.2012 | [2013/03] | Priority number, date | DE20111051781 | 12.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011051781 | [2013/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2546599 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/25, G01M11/02, G01N21/55 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
G01B11/2513 (EP);
G01M11/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Deflektometrische Anordnung zur Oberflächeninspektion | [2013/03] | English: | Deflectometric assembly for surface inspection | [2013/03] | French: | Système déflectométrique destiné à lýinspection de surfaces | [2013/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 28.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/03] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102006006876 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1-3 * [I] 4; | [XI]DE19545367 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 8, line 17 - line 41; figure 1a * * column 9, line 47 - column 10, line 17; figure 3 * [I] 4; | [XI]US2003231793 (CRAMPTON STEPHEN JAMES [GB]) [X] 1,2 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0088]; figures 3a,29b * [I] 4 | [XI] - FORREST A K ET AL, "Single-grid moiré interferometer; Single-grid moiré interferometer", JOURNAL OF OPTICS. A, PURE AND APPLIED OPTICS, INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20010901), vol. 3, no. 5, doi:10.1088/1464-4258/3/5/303, ISSN 1464-4258, pages 326 - 332, XP020080781 [X] 1-3 * Abschnitte 1 und 2;;; figures 1,2 * [I] 4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/1464-4258/3/5/303 | by applicant | DE10345586 |