EP2508770 - Universal shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BF New Technologies GmbH Julius Saxler-Straße 4 54550 Daun/Vulkaneifel / DE | [2013/47] |
Former [2012/41] | For all designated states BF New Technologies GmbH Südring 12 63165 Mühlheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Disser, Claus Max-Planck-Straße 41 63500 Seligenstadt / DE | [2012/41] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2012/41] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Cronstettenstraße 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 12174072.4 | 28.04.2010 | [2012/41] | Priority number, date | DE20092006696U | 08.05.2009 Original published format: DE 202009006696 U | [2012/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2508770 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/223, F16D3/84 | [2012/41] | CPC: |
F16D3/223 (EP,US);
F16D3/845 (EP,US);
F16D2003/22306 (EP,US);
F16D2003/22316 (EP,US);
F16D2003/22326 (EP,US);
F16D2300/06 (EP,US);
F16D3/065 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/41] | Title | German: | Gelenkwelle | [2012/41] | English: | Universal shaft | [2012/41] | French: | Arbre universel | [2012/41] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 10.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/51] | 07.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10719588.5 / EP2427667 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100719588) is 03.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58152931 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]US4476950 (WELSCHOF HANS-HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]GB2311758 (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [I]DE20321604U (SHAFT FORM ENGINEERING GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-5 * paragraph [0076]; figure - * | by applicant | DE19609423 | DE19938771 | DE10220715 |