EP2680607 - A headset device with fitting memory [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GN Netcom A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersen, Michael Hoby Krogerupgade 7, 4. th. DK-2200 København N / DK | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 12174384.3 | 29.06.2012 | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2680607 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/08, H04R1/10 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
H04R1/08 (EP,US);
H04R1/105 (EP,US);
H04R2201/107 (EP,US);
H04R2201/109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kopfhörervorrichtung mit Passformspeicher | [2014/01] | English: | A headset device with fitting memory | [2014/01] | French: | Casque audio avec mémoire de fixation | [2014/01] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 01.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/13] | 21.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.06.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2012030461 (MOTOROLA MOBILITY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0066] * * figures 1,3,21,22,23 * [I] 6,8-11; | [XDI]JPH04170198 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [XD] 1,2,13,15 * abstract * [I] 14; | [A]US2011228925 (BIRCH OLE [DK]) [A] 8-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0027] * * figures 3-7 *; | [A]US2009175480 (ZHOU WALES [CN]) [A] 6 * abstract * * figure 3A * | by applicant | JPH04170198 |