EP2541371 - Flexible display panel and display apparatus including the flexible display panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.07.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2022 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 17113, 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/40] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jin, Dong-Un c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No. 24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City 446-711 Gyunggi-Do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Woo-Jong c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No. 24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City 446-711 Gyunggi-Do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Yang-Wan Samsung Display 508 Seongseong-Dong Seobuk-gu Cheonan-City Chungcheongnam-Do 330-300 / KR | 04 /
Kim, Young-Sik Module Development Team 1 (OLED) Samsung Display 465 Beonyeong-ro Seobuk-gu, Cheonan-City Chungcheongnam-Do 331-710 / KR | 05 /
Lyu, Jun-Sang c/o Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No. 24 Nongseo-Dong Giheung-Gu Yongin-City 446-711 Gyunggi-Do / KR | 06 /
Kim, Sang-Min Legal Department of Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-gu Yongin-City Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2013/02] | Representative(s) | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 12174497.3 | 29.06.2012 | [2013/01] | Priority number, date | KR20110065143 | 30.06.2011 Original published format: KR 20110065143 | KR20120063871 | 14.06.2012 Original published format: KR 20120063871 | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2541371 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2541371 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G06F3/041 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
G06F1/1637 (EP,US);
G06F3/041 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04103 (EP,US);
H10K2102/311 (EP,US);
H10K50/841 (US);
H10K50/8445 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Flexible Anzeigetafel und Anzeigevorrichtung mit der flexiblen Anzeigetafel | [2013/01] | English: | Flexible display panel and display apparatus including the flexible display panel | [2013/01] | French: | Panneau d'affichage souple et appareil d'affichage comprenant le panneau d'affichage souple | [2013/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 30.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.06.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | Appeal following examination | 14.09.2016 | Appeal received No. T2742/16 | 17.11.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.07.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP22181833.9 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009086095 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [A] 17-22 * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 26 * * page 4, line 16 - line 24 * * page 34, line 21 - page 35, line 2 ** claims 1-3 *; | [A]US2010001971 (JIANG KAI-LI [CN], et al) [A] 17-21,23-25,29 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0102] * * figure 18 *; | [XI]US2011050657 (YAMADA TADASHI [JP]) [X] 1-19,21,26-28 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0128] * * paragraph [0144] * * paragraph [0183] * * paragraph [0266] * * paragraph [0277] * * claim 1 * * figures 1-6 * * figures 9A, 9C * [I] 20,22-25,29 |