EP2570374 - Bobbin for coiling and uncoiling elongated materials and bobbins assembly with at least one such bobbin or for at least one such bobbin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wocken, Heinrich Baumschulenweg 49716 Meppen / DE | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Werner & ten Brink Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Am Berghang 61 48455 Bad Bentheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Werner & ten Brink Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Am Berghang 61 48455 Bad Bentheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12175261.2 | 06.07.2012 | [2013/12] | Priority number, date | DE20111053621 | 14.09.2011 Original published format: DE102011053621 | [2013/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2570374 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2570374 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B65H49/32, B65H75/22 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
B65H75/2209 (EP,US);
B65H49/32 (EP);
B65H49/325 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Haspel zum Auf- und Abwickeln von langgestreckten Materialien und Haspelanlage mit zumindest einer solchen Haspel oder für zumindest eine solche Haspel | [2013/12] | English: | Bobbin for coiling and uncoiling elongated materials and bobbins assembly with at least one such bobbin or for at least one such bobbin | [2013/12] | French: | Bobine pour l'enroulement et le déroulement de matériaux allongés et installation de bobines avec au moins une telle bobine ou pour au moins une telle bobine | [2013/12] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 28.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]US3791606 (BROWN W) [YD] 1-4,6 * figures 1,3 * [A] 5; | [Y]US2004178301 (WAMPLER CARL [US], et al) [Y] 1-4,6 * paragraphs [0008] , [0024] - [0030]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US7281679 (JONES DOUGLAS KEVIN [US]) [Y] 1-3* column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 35; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US3791606 | US5467939 | JP2004043176 |