EP2514841 - Methods and compositions for the assessment of drug response [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theranostics Laboratory P.O. Box 1433 Auckland / NZ | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gunes, Arzu Liljegaten 6A 753 24 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
Dahl, Marja-Lisa Stockby Hällar 9 179 62 Stenhamra / SE | 03 /
Webster, Mark 26 Claude Road Epsom Auckland 1023 / NZ | 04 /
Gladding, Patrick 153 Mountain Road Epsom Auckland / NZ | [2013/08] |
Former [2012/44] | 01 /
Gunes, Arzu Uppsala University Akademiska sjukhuset 751 85 Uppsala / SE | ||
02 /
Dahl, Marja-Lisa Stockby Hällar 9 179 62 Stenhamra / SE | |||
03 /
Webster, Mark 26 Claude Road Epsom Auckland 1023 / NZ | |||
04 /
Gladding, Patrick 153 Mountain Road Epsom Auckland / NZ | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 13 03 91 20103 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12175531.8 | 23.01.2009 | [2012/43] | Priority number, date | US20080023596P | 25.01.2008 Original published format: US 23596 P | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2514841 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
A61K31/4365 (US);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C12Q1/6827 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Zusammensetzungen zur Beurteilung einer Reaktion auf ein Arzneimittel | [2012/43] | English: | Methods and compositions for the assessment of drug response | [2012/43] | French: | Procédés et composition pour évaluer la réponse aux médicaments | [2012/43] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/31] | 25.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09732690.4 / EP2265731 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY] - J. T. BRANDT ET AL, "Common polymorphisms of CYP2C19 and CYP2C9 affect the pharmacokinetic and pharmacodynamic response to clopidogrel but not prasugrel", JOURNAL OF THROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, (20071201), vol. 5, no. 12, doi:10.1111/j.1538-7836.2007.02775.x, ISSN 1538-7933, pages 2429 - 2436, XP055038222 [X] 12-14 * the whole document * [A] 1,4-7,10,11 [Y] 2,3,8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1538-7836.2007.02775.x | [XAY] - JEAN-SÉBASTIEN HULOT ET AL, "Cytochrome P450 2C19 loss-of-function polymorphism is a major determinant of clopidogrel responsiveness in healthy subjects", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, vol. 108, no. 7, doi:10.1182/BLOOD-2006-04-013052, ISSN 0006-4971, (20061001), pages 2244 - 2247, (20060613), XP002664900 [X] 12-14 * the whole document * [A] 1,4-7,10,11 [Y] 2,3,8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2006-04-013052 | [IAY] - INGELMAN-SUNDBERG ET AL, "Influence of cytochrome P450 polymorphisms on drug therapies: Pharmacogenetic, pharmacoepigenetic and clinical aspects", PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, ELSEVIER, GB, (20071120), vol. 116, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.PHARMTHERA.2007.09.004, ISSN 0163-7258, pages 496 - 526, XP022354106 [I] 1,4-7,10,11 * the whole document * [A] 12-14 [Y] 2,3,8,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pharmthera.2007.09.004 | [A] - SCHROTH WERNER ET AL, "Breast cancer treatment outcome with adjuvant tamoxifen relative to patient CYP2D6 and CYP2C19 genotypes.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY 20 NOV 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:18024866, (20071120), vol. 25, no. 33, ISSN 1527-7755, pages 5187 - 5193, XP002683485 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2007.12.2705 | [A] - SIM SARAH C ET AL, "A common novel CYP2C19 gene variant causes ultrarapid drug metabolism relevant for the drug response to proton pump inhibitors and antidepressants.", CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS JAN 2006 LNKD- PUBMED:16413245, (200601), vol. 79, no. 1, ISSN 0009-9236, pages 103 - 113, XP002683486 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clpt.2005.10.002 | [A] - JOSEPH A. JAKUBOWSKI ET AL, "Prasugrel: A Novel Thienopyridine Antiplatelet Agent. A Review of Preclinical and Clinical Studies and the Mechanistic Basis for Its Distinct Antiplatelet Profile", CARDIOVASCULAR DRUG REVIEWS, (20071201), vol. 25, no. 4, doi:10.1111/j.1527-3466.2007.00027.x, ISSN 0897-5957, pages 357 - 374, XP055038224 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1527-3466.2007.00027.x | by applicant | US5242794 | WO9512607 | US5578832 | US5679524 | WO9859066 | US5861242 | US5871918 | US5919626 | US5945283 | US5952174 | US6183698 | US6287850 | US6291183 | US6297018 | US6306643 | US6308170 | US6706689 | US6821733 | US2005042608 | US2005059030 | US7110585 | US7354389 | - REICH DE ET AL., "Linkage disequilibrium in the human genome", NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, doi:doi:10.1038/35075590, pages 199 - 204, XP001026202 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35075590 | - URITA ET AL., PNAS, (1989), vol. 86, pages 2766 - 2770 | - CARUTHERS ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., SYMP.. SER.., (1980), pages 215 - 233 | - SCHWEITZER; KINGSMORE, "Measuring proteins on microarrays", CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 13, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/S0958-1669(02)00278-1, pages 14 - 9, XP002257442 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0958-1669(02)00278-1 | - AVSEEKNO ET AL., "Immobilization of proteins in immunochemical microarrays fabricated by electrospray deposition", ANAL CHEM, (20001215), vol. 73, no. 24, doi:doi:10.1021/ac010460q, pages 6047 - 52, XP001108800 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac010460q | - HUANG, "Detection of multiple proteins in an antibody-based protein microarray system", IMMUNOL METHODS, (20001201), vol. 255, no. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-1759(01)00394-5, pages 1 - 13, XP004274816 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(01)00394-5 | - ALTSCHUL, J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - BRUTLAG, COMP. CHEM., (1993), vol. 17, pages 203 - 207 | - LAU WC; GURBEL PA; WATKINS PB ET AL., "Contribution of hepatic cytochrome P450 3A4 metabolic activity to the phenomenon of clopidogrel resistance", CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 109, no. 2, pages 166 - 71 | - HULOT JS; BURA A; VILLARD E ET AL., "Cytochrome P450 2C19 toss-of-function polymorphism is a major determinant of clopidogrel responsiveness in healthy subjects", BLOOD, (2006), vol. 108, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2006-04-013052, pages 2244 - 7, XP002664900 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2006-04-013052 | - ANGIOLILLO DJ; FERNANDEZ-ORTIZ A; BERNARDO E ET AL., "Contribution of gene sequence variations of the hepatic cytochrome P450 3A4 enzyme to variability in individual responsiveness to clopidogrel", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASE BIOL, (2006), vol. 26, no. 8, pages 1895 - 900 | - FONTANA P; HULOT JS; P DEM; GAUSSEM P, "Influence of CYP2C19 and CYP3A4 gene polymorphisms on clopidogrel responsiveness in healthy subjects", J THROMB HAEMOST, (2007), vol. 5, no. 10, pages 2153 - 5 | - VON BECKERATH N; TAUBERT D; POGATSA-MURRAY G; SCHOMIG E; KASTRATI A; SCHOMIG A, "Absorption, metaboiization, and antiplatelet effects of 300-, 600-, and 900-mg loading doses of clopidogrel: results of the ISAR-CHOICE (Intracoronary Stenting and Antithrombotic Regimen: Choose Between 3 High Oral Doses for Immediate Clopidogrel Effect) Trial", CIRCULATION, (2005), vol. 112, no. 19, pages 2946 - 50 | - TAUBERT D; VON BECKERATH N; GRIMBERG G ET AL., "Impact of P-glycoprotein on clopidogrel absorption", CLIN PHARMACOL THER, (2006), vol. 80, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/j.clpt.2006.07.007, pages 486 - 501, XP005739747 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clpt.2006.07.007 | - VAN WERKUM JW; VAN DER STELT CA; SEESING TH; HACKENG CM; TEN BERG JM, "A head-to-head comparison between the VerifyNow P2Y12 assay and light transmittance aggregometry for monitoring the individual platelet response to clopidogrel in patients undergoing elective percutaneous coronary intervention", J THROMB HAEMOST, (2006), vol. 4, no. 11, pages 2516 - 8 | - SEREBRUANY VL; STEINHUBL SR; BERGER PB; MALININ AI; BHATT DL; TOPOL EJ, "Variability in platelet responsiveness to clopidogrel among 544 individuals", JAM COLL CARDIOL, (2005), vol. 45, no. 2, pages 246 - 51 | - LEV EI; PATEL RT; MARESH KJ ET AL., "Aspirin and clopidogrel drug response in patients undergoing percutaneous coronary intervention: the role of dual drug resistance", JAM COLL CARDIOL, (2006), vol. 47, no. 1, pages 27 - 33 | - LUO HR; POLAND RE; LIN KM; WAN YJ, "Genetic polymorphism of cytochrome P450 2C19 in Mexican Americans: a cross-ethnic comparative study", CLIN PHARMACOL THER, (2006), vol. 80, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.clpt.2006.03.003, pages 33 - 40, XP005523873 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clpt.2006.03.003 | - CHEN ZM; JIANG LX; CHEN YP ET AL., "Addition of clopidogrel to aspirin in 45,852 patients with acute myocardial infarction: randomised placebo-controlled trial", LANCET, (2005), vol. 366, no. 9497, pages 1607 - 21 | - GILARD M; ARNAUD B; LE GAL G; ABGRALL JF; BOSCHAT J, "Influence of omeprazol on the antiplatelet action of clopidogrel associated to aspirin", J THROMB HAEMOST, (2006), vol. 4, no. 11, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1538-7836.2006.02162.x, pages 2508 - 9, XP055085488 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1538-7836.2006.02162.x | - ROMKES M; FALETTO M; BLAISDELL J; RAUCY J; GOLDSTEIN J, "Cloning and expression of complementary DNAs for multiple members of the human cytochrome P450IIC subfamily", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1021/bi00227a012, pages 3247 - 3255, XP002945904 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00227a012 | - ANGIOLILLO, DJ; FERNZNDEZ-ORTIZ, A; BERNARDO, E; RAMIREZ, C; BARRERA-RAMIREZ, C; SABATE, M; HERNANDEZ, R; MORENO, R; ESCANED, J; A, "Identification of low responders to a 300-mg clopidogrel loading dose in patients undergoing coronary stenting", THROMB RES, (2005), vol. 115, doi:doi:10.1016/j.thromres.2004.07.007, pages 101 - 108, XP004655952 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.thromres.2004.07.007 | - GURBEL, PA; BLIDEN, KP; HIATT, BL; O'CONNOR, CM, "Clopidogrel for coronary stenting: response variability, drug resistance, and the effect of pretreatment platelet reactivity", CIRCULATION, (2003), vol. 107, doi:doi:10.1161/01.CIR.0000072771.11429.83, pages 2908 - 2913, XP055004841 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.CIR.0000072771.11429.83 | - GURBEL, PA; TANTRY, US, "Drug insight: Clopidogrel nonresponsiveness", NAT CLIN PRACT CARDIOVASC MED, (2006), vol. 3, pages 387 - 395 | - GURBEL, PA; BLIDEN, KP; HAYES, KM; YOHO, JA; HERZOG, WR; TANTRY, US, "The relation of dosing to clopidogrel responsiveness and the incidence of high post-treatment platelet aggregation in patients undergoing coronary stenting", JAM CARDIO, (2005), vol. 45, pages 1392 - 1396, XP027719733 | - MOBLEY, JE; BRESEE, SJ; WORTHAM, DC; CRAFT, RM; SNIDER, CC; CARROLL, RC, "Frequency of nonresponse antiplatelet activity of clopidogrel during pretreatment for cardiac catheterization", AMJ CARDIOL, (2004), vol. 93, pages 456 - 458 | - MULLER, I; BESTA, F; SCHULZ, C; MASSBERG, S; SCHONIG, A; GAWAZ, M, "Prevalence of clopidogrel non-responders among patients with stable angina pectoris scheduled for elective coronary stent placement", THROMB HAEMOST, (2003), vol. 89, pages 783 - 787 | - AJZENBERG, N; AUBRY, P; HUISSE, MG; CACHIER, A; EI, AW; FELDMAN, LJ; HIMBERT, D; BARUCH, D; GUILLIN, MC; STEG, PG, "Enhanced shear-induced platelet aggregation in patients who experience subacute stent thrombosis: a case-control study", J AM COLL CARDIOL, (2005), vol. 45, pages 1753 - 1756 | - BARRAGAN, P; BOUVIER, JL; ROQUEBERT, PO; MACALUSO, G; COMMEAU, P; COMET, B; LAFONT, A; CAMOIN, L; WALTER, U; EIGENTHALER, M, "Resistance to thienopyridines: clinical detection of coronary stent thrombosis by monitoring of vasolidator-stimulated phosphoprotein phosphorylation", CATHETER CARDIOVASC INTERV, (2003), vol. 59, pages 295 - 302 | - CUISSET, T; FRERE, C; QUILICI, J; BARBOU, F; MORANGE, PE; HOVASSE, T; BONNET, JL; ALESSI, MC, "High post-treatment platelet reactivity identified low-responders to dual antiplatelet therapy at increased risk of recurrent cardiovascular events after stenting for acute coronary syndrome", J THROMB HAEMOST, (2006), vol. 4, pages 542 - 549 | - GURBEL, PA; BLIDEN, KP; SAMARA, W; YOHO, JA; HAYES, K; FISSHA, MZ; TANTRY, US, "Clopidogrel effect on platelet reactivity in patients with stent thrombosis: results of CREST study", JAM COLL CARDIOL, (2005), vol. 46, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jacc.2005.07.056, pages 1827 - 1832, XP029656533 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2005.07.056 | - GURBEL, PA; BLIDEN, KP; GUYER, K; CHO, PW; ZAMAN, KA; KREUTZ, RP; BASSI, AK; TANTRY, US, "Platelet reactivity in patients and recurrent events post-stenting: results of the PREPARE POST-STENTING Study", JAM COLL CARDIOL, (2005), vol. 46, pages 1820 - 1826 | - MATETZKY, S; SHENKMAN, B; GUETTA, V; SHECHTER, M; BIENART, R; GOLDENBERG, I; NOVIKOV, I; PRES, H; SAVION, N; VARON, D, "Clopidogrel resistance is associated with increased risk of recurrent atherothrombotic events in patients with acute myocardial infarction", CIRCULATION, (2004), vol. 109, pages 3171 - 3175 | - STEINHUBL, SR; BERGER, PB; MANN, JT; III, FRY; ET, DELAGO; A, WILMER; C, TOPOL, "EJ. Early and sustained dual oral antiplatelet therapy following percutaneous coronary intervention: a randomized controlled trial", JAMA, (2002), vol. 288, pages 2411 - 2420 | - YUSUF, S; ZHAO, F; MEHTA, SR; CHROLAVICIUS, S; TOGNONI, G; FOX, KK, "Effects of clopidogrel in addition to aspirin in patients with acute coronary syndromes without ST-segment elevation", N ENGL J MED, (2001), vol. 345, pages 494 - 502 | - BRAUNWALD, E; ANTMAN, EM; BEASLEY, JW; CALIFF, RM; CHEITIN, MD; HOCHMAN, JS; JONES, RH; KEREIAKES, D; KUPERSMITH, J; LEVIN, TN, "ACC/AHA 2002 guideline update for the management of patients with unstable angina and non--ST-segment elevantion myocardial infarction - summary article: a report of the American College Cardiology/American Heart Association task force on practice guidelines (Committee on the Management of Patients", J AM COLL CARDIOL, (2002), vol. 40, pages 1366 - 1374 | - SMITH, SC, JR.; FELDMAN, TE; HIRSHFELD, JW, JR; JACOBS, AK; KERN, MJ; KING, SB, III; MORRISON, DA; O'NEIL, WW; SCHAFF, HV; WHITLOW, "ACC/AHA/SCAI 2005 guideline update for percutaneous coronary intervention: a report of the American College of Cardiology/American Heart Association Task Force on Practice Guidelines (ACC/AHA/SCAI Writing Committee to Update 2001 Guidelines for Percutaneous Coronary Intervention", CIRCULATION, (2006), vol. 113, pages E166 - E286 | - ASAI, F; JAKUBOWSKI, JA; NAGANUMA, H; BRANDT, JT; MATSUSHIMA, N; HIROTA, T; FREESTONE, S; WINTERS, KJ, "Platelet inhibitory activity and pharmacokinetics of prasugrel (CS-747) a novel thienopyridine P2Y12 inhibitor: a single ascending dose study done in humans", PLATELETS, (2006), vol. 17, pages 209 - 217 | - JAKUBOWSKI, JA; PAYNE, CD; BRANDT, JT; WEERAKKODY, GJ; FARID, NA; SMALL, DS; NAGANUMA, H; LI, GY; WINTERS, KJ, "The platelet inhibitory effects and pharmacokinetics of prasugrel after administration of loading and maintenance doses in healthy subjects", J CARDIOVASC PHARMACOL, (2006), vol. 47, pages 377 - 384 | - JERNBERG, T; PAYNE, CD; WINTERS, KJ; DARSTEIN, C; BRANDT, JT; JAKUBOWSKI, JA; NAGANUMA, H; SIEGBAHN, A; WALLENTIN, L, "Prasurgrel achieves greater inhibition aggregation and a lower rate of non-responders compared with clopidogrel in aspirin-treated patients with stable coronary artery disease", EUR HEART J, (2006), vol. 27, pages 1166 - 1173 | - MATSUSHIMI, N; JAKUBOWSKI, JA; ASAI, F; NAGANUMA, H; BRANDT, JT; HIROTA, T; FREESTONE, S; WINTERS, KJ, "Platelet inhibitory activity and pharmacokinetics ofprasugrel (CS-747) a novel thienopyridine P2Y12 inhibitor: a multiple-dose study in healthy humans", PLATELETS, (2006), vol. 17, pages 218 - 226, XP009141441 | - BRANDT, JT; PAYNE, CD; WIVIOTT, SD; WEERAKKODY, G; FARID, NA; SMALL, DS; JAKUBOWSKI, JA; NAGANUMA, H; WINTERS, KJ, "A comparison of prasugurel and clopidogrel loading doses on platelet function: magnitude of platelet inhibition is related to active metabolite formation", AM HEART J, (2007), vol. 153, pages 66.E9 - 66.E16 | - REHMEL, JL; ECKSTEIN, JA; FARID, NA; HEIM, JB; KASPER, SC; KURIHARA, A; WRIGHTON, SA; RING, BJ, "Interactions of two major metabolites of prasugrel, a thienopyridine antiplatelet agent, with the cytocrhomes P450", DRUG METAB DISPOS, (2006), vol. 34, pages 600 - 607 | - GURBEL PA; BLIDEN KP; DICHIARA J ET AL., "Evaluation of dose-related effects of aspirin on platelet function: results from the Aspirin-Induced Platelet Effect (ASPECT) study", CIRCULATION, (2007), vol. 115, no. 25, doi:doi:10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.106.675587, pages 3156 - 64, XP055206971 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/CIRCULATIONAHA.106.675587 | - HARRISON P, "Platelet function analysis", BLOOD REV, (2005), vol. 19, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/j.blre.2004.05.002, pages 111 - 23, XP004683019 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.blre.2004.05.002 | - EIKELBOOM JW; HIRSH J; WEITZ JI; JOHNSTON M; YI Q; YUSUF S, "Aspirin-resistant thromboxane biosynthesis and the risk of myocardial infarction, stroke, or cardiovascular death in patients at high risk for cardiovascular events", CIRCULATION, (2002), vol. 105, no. 14, doi:doi:10.1161/01.cir.0000013777.21160.07, pages 1650 - 5, XP002681251 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.cir.0000013777.21160.07 | - GEIGER J; BRICH J; HONIG-LIEDL P ET AL., "Specific impairment of human platelet P2Y(AC) ADP receptor-mediated signaling by the antiplatelet drug clopidogrel", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASC BIOL, (1999), vol. 19, no. 8, pages 2007 - 11, XP001121745 | - DYSZKIEWICZ-KORPANTY AM; FRENKEL EP; SARODE R, "Approach to the assessment of platelet function: comparison between optical-based platelet-rich plasma and impedance-based whole blood platelet aggregation methods", CLIN APPL THROMB HEMOST, (2005), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1177/107602960501100103, pages 25 - 35, XP009166470 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/107602960501100103 | - SCHLAMMADINGER A; KERENYI A; MUSZBEK L; BODA Z, "Comparison of the O'Brien filter test and the PFA-100 platelet analyzer in the laboratory diagnosis of von Willebrand's disease", THROMB HAEMOST, (2000), vol. 84, no. 1, pages 88 - 92 | - HAYWARD CP; HARRISON P; CATTANEO M; ORTEL TL; RAO AK, "Platelet function analyzer (PFA)-100 closure time in the evaluation of platelet disorders and platelet function: reply to a rebuttal", J THROMB HAEMOST, (2006), vol. 4, no. 6, page 1432 | - COLEMAN JL WJ; SIMON DI, "Determination of individual response to aspirin therapy using the Accumetrics Ultegra RFPA-ASA system", POINT OF CARE, (2004), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 77 - 82 | - WHEELER GL; BRADEN GA; STEINHUBL SR ET AL., "The Ultegra rapid platelet-function assay: comparison to standard platelet function assays in patients undergoing percutaneous coronary intervention with abciximab therapy", AM HEART J, (2002), vol. 143, no. 4, pages 602 - 11 | - FRELINGER AL, 3RD; FURMAN MI; LINDEN MD ET AL., "Residual arachidonic acid-induced platelet activation via an adenosine diphosphate-dependent but cyclooxygenase-l- and cyclooxygenase-2-independent pathway: a 700-patient study of aspirin resistance", CIRCULATION, (2006), vol. 113, no. 25, pages 2888 - 96 | - SAVI, P; HERBERT, JM, "Clopidogrel and ticlopidine: P2Y12 adenosine diphosphate-receptor antagonists for the prevention of atherothrombosis", SEMIN THROM HEMOST, (2005), vol. 31, pages 174 - 183 | - SUGIDACHI, A; ASAI, F; OGAWA, T; INOUE, T; KOIKE, H, "The in vivo pharmaceutical profile of CS-747, a novel antiplatelet agent with platelet ADP receptor antagonist properties", BR J PHARMACOL, (2000), vol. 129, doi:doi:10.1038/sj.bjp.0703237, pages 1439 - 1446, XP002951065 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0703237 | - GOTO, S; TAMURA, N; ISHIDA, H; RUGGERI, ZM, "Dependence of platelet thrombus stability on sustained glycoprotein Iib/IIIa activation through adenosine 5'diphosphate receptor stimulation and cyclic calcium signaling", JAM COLL CARDIOL, (2006), vol. 47, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jacc.2005.08.055, pages 155 - 162, XP028006020 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2005.08.055 | - CATTANEO, M, "The platelet P2Y receptors as targets for new antithrombotic drugs", J THROMB HAEMOST, (2003), vol. 1, pages 1133 - 1135 |