EP2566155 - Method and apparatus for advertisement placement in a user dialog on a set-top box [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 10.01.2024 [2024/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TiVo Solutions Inc. 2160 Gold Street San Jose CA 95002 / US | [2017/52] |
Former [2017/13] | For all designated states TiVo Solutions Inc. 2 Circle Star Way San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | ||
Former [2017/11] | For all designated states TiVo Solutions Inc. 2160 Gold Street P.O. Box 2160 Alviso, CA 95002-2160 / US | ||
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states TiVo Inc. 2160 Gold Street Alviso, CA 95002 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barton, James M. 2160 Gold Street Alviso, CA 95002 / US | 02 /
Stevens, Paul 1010 El Solyo Heights Drive Felton, CA 95018 / US | 03 /
Sandford, David 80 Evergreen Lane Berkeley, CA 94705 / US | 04 /
Hayes, Robin 1916 Ivy Lane Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 05 /
Schmidt, Margret 2046 Stockbridge Avenue Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 06 /
Klein, Bruce 440 Olive Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94061 / US | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Dendorfer, Claus Dendorfer & Herrmann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Bayerstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12175982.3 | 21.06.2007 | [2013/10] | Priority number, date | US20060474039 | 23.06.2006 Original published format: US 474039 | US20060492281 | 24.07.2006 Original published format: US 492281 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2566155 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2566155 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, G06F3/00, G06F13/00, G06Q30/02 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0241 (EP,US);
H04N21/4622 (US);
H04N21/4147 (EP,US);
H04N21/432 (US);
H04N21/4325 (EP,US);
H04N21/4335 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/458 (EP,US);
H04N21/472 (US);
H04N21/47217 (US);
H04N21/482 (US);
H04N21/4882 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,US);
H04N5/765 (EP,US);
H04N5/775 (EP,US);
H04N5/7755 (EP,US);
H04N5/781 (EP,US);
H04N5/907 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Platzierung von Werbung in einen Benutzerdialog über eine Set-Top-Box | [2013/10] | English: | Method and apparatus for advertisement placement in a user dialog on a set-top box | [2013/10] | French: | Procédé et appareil de positionnement de publicité dans une boîte de dialogue utilisateur sur un boîtier décodeur | [2013/10] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 15.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.11.2018 | 19.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/02] | 16.11.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/02] | Appeal following examination | 05.03.2019 | Appeal received No. T2013/19 | 24.05.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.11.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | 16.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07835850.4 / EP2033073 | Divisional application(s) | EP23209892.1 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070835850) is 01.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0059220 (DIVA SYSTEMS CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 11, line 31 - page 13, line 3 *; | [XI]WO0176249 (UNITED VIDEO PROPERTIES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,9-13 * abstract * * page 15, line 9 - page 17, line 6 * * page 22, line 13 - page 23, line 8 * [I] 1-13; | [A]US2003131357 (KIM KYUNG-AH [KR]) [A] 1-13* abstract * | by applicant | US6233389 | US6850691 | US20040915990 |