EP2549098 - Method for operating a wind turbine and wind turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2023 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 05.04.2023 [2023/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy Service GmbH Beim Strohhause 17-31 20097 Hamburg / DE | [2022/32] |
Former [2020/17] | For all designated states Senvion Deutschland GmbH Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2015/36] | For all designated states Senvion GmbH Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states Senvion SE Überseering 10 (Oval Office) 22297 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states REpower Systems SE Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states REpower Systems AG Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gätjens, Jörg Franz-Pantel-Ring 53 24783 Osterrönfeld / DE | 02 /
Rieck, Christian Kieler Str. 442 24536 Neumünster / DE | [2013/37] |
Former [2013/32] | 01 /
Gätjens, Jörg Franz-Pantel-Ring 24783 Osterrönfeld / DE | ||
02 /
Rieck, Christian Kieler Str. 442 24536 Neumünster / DE | |||
Former [2013/04] | 01 /
Gätjens, Jörg Lancasterstr. 9 24768 Rendsburg / DE | ||
02 /
Rieck, Christian Kieler Str. 442 24536 Neumünster / DE | Representative(s) | Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2023/14] |
Former [2017/01] | Seemann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2013/04] | Seemann, Ralph Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Ballindamm 3 20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12176256.1 | 13.07.2012 | [2013/04] | Priority number, date | DE20111079344 | 18.07.2011 Original published format: DE102011079344 | [2013/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2549098 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2549098 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2549098 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2549098 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
F03D7/0208 (EP);
F03D7/0204 (EP);
F03D7/0268 (EP);
F05B2230/80 (EP);
F05B2270/329 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2013/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Windenergieanlage sowie Windenergieanlage | [2013/04] | English: | Method for operating a wind turbine and wind turbine | [2013/04] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement d'une éolienne et éolienne | [2013/04] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/10] | 28.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.09.2017
ADMISSIBLE ENERCON GmbH Dreekamp 5 26605 Aurich / DE Opponent's representative Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2017/45] | 08.11.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.03.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.11.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.08.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.02.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 16.01.2020 | Appeal received No. T0146/20 | 05.03.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.08.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.07.2012 | AL | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | FI | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | IT | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | MK | 04.01.2017 | MT | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | RS | 04.01.2017 | SE | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | SM | 04.01.2017 | TR | 04.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | AT | 13.07.2017 | IE | 13.07.2017 | LU | 13.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | CH | 31.07.2017 | LI | 31.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 13.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
TR | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
AT | 13.07.2017 | ||
IE | 13.07.2017 | ||
LU | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 13.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
AT | 13.07.2017 | ||
IE | 13.07.2017 | ||
LU | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 13.07.2012 | |
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
AT | 13.07.2017 | ||
IE | 13.07.2017 | ||
LU | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 13.07.2012 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
AT | 13.07.2017 | ||
IE | 13.07.2017 | ||
LU | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
AT | 13.07.2017 | ||
IE | 13.07.2017 | ||
LU | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
AT | 13.07.2017 | ||
IE | 13.07.2017 | ||
LU | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 13.07.2017 | ||
LU | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 13.07.2017 | ||
LU | 13.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 13.07.2017 | ||
LU | 13.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
IE | 13.07.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
CH | 31.07.2017 | ||
LI | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
IT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
FI | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | FI | 04.01.2017 | |
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SE | 04.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19717059 (AERODYN ENG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,13,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 14 * [I] 4,5,7-12,14; | [XI]WO2005116445 (NORDEX ENERGY GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,13,15 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 *[I] 5,8-12,14; | [XI]US2009081041 (FRESE THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6,13,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0031] * * figures 1,2 * [I] 4,5,7-12,14; | [XI]WO2010128940 (XEMC XIANGTAN ELECTRIC MFG GRO [CN], et al) [X] 1-7,13 * abstract * * page 3, line 33 - page 5, line 19 * * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 5 * * figures 1,2 * * page 2, line 15 - line 25 * [I] 8-12,14,15 | Opposition | DE19717059 | US2009081041 | EP2044325 | WO2009043352 | US2010135787 | WO2010128940 | DE102010011549 | - BU, "Study and implementation of a control algorithm for wind turbine yaw control system", World Non-Grid-Connected Wind Power and Energy Conference, 2009. WNWEC 2009,, (20090924), page 5pp, XP031568378 | - "56F8013 Data Sheet", (20040400), pages 1 - 123, freescale semiconductor, URL: www.DatasheetCatalogue.com, XP055623288 |