EP2546735 - Layout editing device and computer-readable storage medium storing layout editing program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8561 / JP | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoshikawa, Hideyuki c/o BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1-1 Kawagishi, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2020/22] |
Former [2013/03] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12176341.1 | 13.07.2012 | [2013/03] | Priority number, date | JP20110156306 | 15.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011156306 | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2546735 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2546735 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2546735 | Date: | 27.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/21, G06F3/12 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
G06F3/1204 (EP,US);
G06F3/1257 (EP,US);
G06F3/1292 (EP,US);
G06F40/103 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/03] | G06F3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/22] |
Former [2013/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Layoutbearbeitungsvorrichtung und computerlesbares Speichermedium, das ein Layoutbearbeitungsprogramm speichert | [2013/03] | English: | Layout editing device and computer-readable storage medium storing layout editing program | [2013/03] | French: | Dispositif d'édition de mise en page et support de stockage lisible par ordinateur stockant un programme d'édition de mise en page | [2013/03] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 18.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.12.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.07.2012 | AL | 27.05.2020 | AT | 27.05.2020 | CY | 27.05.2020 | CZ | 27.05.2020 | DK | 27.05.2020 | EE | 27.05.2020 | ES | 27.05.2020 | FI | 27.05.2020 | HR | 27.05.2020 | IT | 27.05.2020 | LT | 27.05.2020 | LV | 27.05.2020 | MC | 27.05.2020 | MK | 27.05.2020 | MT | 27.05.2020 | NL | 27.05.2020 | PL | 27.05.2020 | RO | 27.05.2020 | RS | 27.05.2020 | SE | 27.05.2020 | SI | 27.05.2020 | SK | 27.05.2020 | SM | 27.05.2020 | TR | 27.05.2020 | IE | 13.07.2020 | LU | 13.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 27.08.2020 | NO | 27.08.2020 | GR | 28.08.2020 | IS | 27.09.2020 | PT | 28.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.07.2012 | |
AL | 27.05.2020 | ||
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CY | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
MT | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 13.07.2020 | ||
LU | 13.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
TR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 13.07.2020 | ||
LU | 13.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
IE | 13.07.2020 | ||
LU | 13.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SI | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 13.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
LU | 13.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
MC | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
PL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SK | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
AT | 27.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 27.05.2020 | ||
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
EE | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
DK | 27.05.2020 | ||
ES | 27.05.2020 | ||
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RO | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
SM | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 27.05.2020 | |
FI | 27.05.2020 | ||
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
NL | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
BG | 27.08.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
RS | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
HR | 27.05.2020 | ||
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
LV | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
GR | 28.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 27.05.2020 | |
LT | 27.05.2020 | ||
SE | 27.05.2020 | ||
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
PT | 28.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 27.05.2020 | |
NO | 27.08.2020 | ||
IS | 27.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 27.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2422701 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 17 - page 17, line 9 ** page 19, line 11 - page 21, line 8 *; | [XI]AU2008250114 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,4,6,9 * page 4, line 5 - page 11, line 19 * * page 15, line 13 - page 16, line 19 * * figures 1-5B, 11A-11B * [I] 2,3,5,7,8,10 | by applicant | JP2003058524 |