EP2687483 - Graphene containing nitrogen and optionally iron and/or cobalt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwab, Matthias Georg Im Lohr 22 68199 Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Müllen, Klaus Geisbergstr. 139 50939 Köln / DE | 03 /
Xinliang, Feng Thomas-Mann-Strasse 11 55122 / DE | 04 /
Parvez, Khaled Hechtsheimer Str. 37A 55131 Mainz / DE | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12176522.6 | 16.07.2012 | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2687483 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/00, C01B31/04 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
B01J21/185 (EP);
B01J27/24 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
B82Y40/00 (EP);
C01B32/00 (EP);
C01B32/194 (EP);
H01G11/36 (EP);
C01B2204/30 (EP);
H01M4/96 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Graphenhaltiger Stickstoff und optional Eisen und/oder Kobalt | [2014/04] | English: | Graphene containing nitrogen and optionally iron and/or cobalt | [2014/04] | French: | Graphène contenant de l'azote et éventuellement du fer et/ou du cobalt | [2014/04] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 22.01.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 23.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 25.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/07] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI] - ZHONG-SHUAI WU ET AL, "3D Nitrogen-Doped Graphene Aerogel-Supported Fe 3 O 4 Nanoparticles as Efficient Electrocatalysts for the Oxygen Reduction Reaction", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20120606), vol. 134, no. 22, doi:10.1021/ja3030565, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 9082 - 9085, XP055053866 [X] 1-6,17-20,22,24,28,30 * the whole document * [A] 11-16 [I] 7-10,21,23,25-27,31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja3030565 | [XAI] - YUANJIAN ZHANG ET AL, "Wet chemical synthesis of nitrogen-doped graphene towards oxygen reduction electrocatalysts without high-temperature pyrolysis", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, (20120215), vol. 22, no. 14, doi:10.1039/c2jm00044j, ISSN 0959-9428, page 6575, XP055054054 [X] 1-6,8,9,17,18,24,28,30 * "Abstract", "Experimental";; table 1 * [A] 19-23 [I] 7,10-16,25-27,29,31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c2jm00044j | [XA] - VINAYAN B P ET AL, "Novel platinum-cobalt alloy nanoparticles dispersed on nitrogen-doped graphene as a cathode electrocatalyst for PEMFC applications", ADVANCED FUNCTIONAL MATERIALS 20120821 WILEY-VCH VERLAG DEU, (20120511), vol. 22, no. 16, doi:10.1002/ADFM.201102544, pages 3519 - 3526, XP002692609 [X] 1,2,7,17,18,24,27,30 * "Abstract";"Experimental section"; page 3521, paragraph l - page 3522, line l * [A] 3-6,8-16,19-23,25,26,28,29,31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ADFM.201102544 | [XA] - SHIN-YI YANG ET AL, "A powerful approach to fabricate nitrogen-doped graphene sheets with high specific surface area", ELECTROCHEMISTRY COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 14, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.ELECOM.2011.10.028, ISSN 1388-2481, (20111031), pages 39 - 42, (20111107), XP028392471 [X] 1,8,9,17,18,24,30 * "Experimental"; first paragraph of "Results and discussion" * [A] 2-7,10-16,19-23,25-29,31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.elecom.2011.10.028 | by applicant | WO2010026046 | WO2011095943 | - L. QU; Y. LIU; J.-B. BAEK; L. DAI, ACS NANO, (2010), vol. 4, page 1321 | - X. LI; H. WANG; J.T. ROBINSON; H. SANCHEZ; G. DIANKOV; H. DA, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2009), vol. 131, page 15939 | - Y.-C. LIN; C.-Y. LIN; P.-W. CHIU, APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2010), vol. 96, page 133110 | - MCCUTCHEON'S, Emulsifiers & Detergents, MCCUTCHEON'S DIRECTORIES, (2008), vol. 1 | - S.M. ZAKEERUDDIN; M. GRATZEI, ADV. FUND. MATER., (2009), vol. 19, pages 2187 - 2202 | - WILLIAM S. HUMMERS JR.; RICHARD E. OFFEMAN, "Preparation of Graphitic Oxide", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1958), vol. 80, no. 6, page 1339 | - K.P. GONG; F. DU; Z.H. XIA; M. DURSTOCK; L.M. DAI, SCIENCE, (2009), vol. 323, page 760 | - R.L LIU; D.Q. WU; X. FENG; K. MÜLLEN, ANGEW. CHEM INT. ED., (2010), vol. 49, page 2565 |