EP2537849 - Azaindoles useful as inhibitors of janus kinases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Incorporated 50 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | [2014/35] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals Inc. 50 Northern Avenue Boston, MA 02210 / US | ||
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Vertex Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 130 Waverly Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Farmer, Luc 5220 Earnscliffe Montreal Quebec H3X 2P5 / CA | 02 /
Martinez-Botella, Gabriel 17 Paramenter Road Wayland, MA 01770 / US | 03 /
Pierce, Albert 295 Harvard Street, Apt. 308 Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | 04 /
Salituro, Francesco 25 Baker Drive Marlboro, MA 01752 / US | 05 /
Wang, Jian 12 Sagamore Road Newton, MA 02461 / US | 06 /
Wannamaker, Marion 375 Harvard Road Stow, MA 01775 / US | 07 /
Wang, Tiansheng 50 Sarah Way Concord, MA 01742 / US | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Cohausz & Florack Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12176813.9 | 17.01.2007 | [2012/52] | Priority number, date | US20060759367P | 17.01.2006 Original published format: US 759367 P | US20060842471P | 06.09.2006 Original published format: US 842471 P | [2012/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2537849 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2537849 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D519/00, A61K31/506, A61K31/517, A61K31/53, A61P25/00, A61P29/00, A61P37/00 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
A61K31/506 (EP,KR,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K31/53 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D495/10 (EP,US);
C07D519/00 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/12 (EP,US);
C12Y207/10002 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Als Inhibitoren von Janus-Kinasen verwendbare Azaindole | [2012/52] | English: | Azaindoles useful as inhibitors of janus kinases | [2012/52] | French: | Azaindoles utiles en tant qu'inhibiteurs des kinases Janus | [2012/52] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 05.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/21] | 12.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07718337.4 / EP1973911 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070718337) is 22.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]WO2005095400 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [ID] 1-28 * claims 1,58-66; table 2; compounds 338, 363-369, 407-413, 418-429 ** paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * | by applicant | US5304121 | US5886026 | US6099562 | WO2005095400 | - S. M. BERGE ET AL., "pharmaceutically acceptable salts", J. PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 |