EP2687360 - Method for arranging a foil in a tray [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Packable B.V. Twentepoort West 27 7609 RD Almelo / NL | [2018/13] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states Packable B.V. Kerkplein 8 7607 BT Almelo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zwaga, Ronald Sluiskade NZ 82 7602 HV Almelo / NL | 02 /
De Olde, Remi Terras 20 7607 BT Almelo / NL | 03 /
Tasma, Alain Wietse Bastiaan Kalevala 9 7604 KG Almelo / NL | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | 't Jong, Bastiaan Jacob Inaday B.V. Hengelosestraat 141 7521 AA Enschede / NL | [2014/04] | Application number, filing date | 12176915.2 | 18.07.2012 | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2687360 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2687360 | Date: | 28.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/09] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2687360 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B31B105/00, B31B120/40, B65B11/52, B65B31/02, B65D1/34, B65D77/20, B65D5/20, B65D5/56, // B65B7/28, B65B9/04, B32B37/06, B32B37/10, B32B37/18, B31B110/10, B31B110/35 | [2017/49] | CPC: |
B65B9/04 (EP,US);
B65B7/28 (US);
B32B37/06 (US);
B32B37/10 (US);
B32B37/18 (US);
B32B38/0012 (US);
B65B11/52 (EP,US);
B65B31/028 (EP,US);
B65D1/34 (US);
B65D5/2047 (EP,US);
B65D5/563 (EP,US);
B65D77/2024 (EP,US);
B31B2100/00 (RU);
B31B2105/00 (EP,US);
B31B2110/10 (EP,US);
B31B2110/35 (EP,US);
B31B2120/404 (EP,US);
B31B2120/406 (EP,US);
B31B50/46 (EP,US);
B32B2439/00 (US);
B65D2577/2025 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1002 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/04] | B31B1/00, B31B7/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] |
Former [2014/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Anordnen einer Folie auf einer Ablage | [2014/04] | English: | Method for arranging a foil in a tray | [2014/04] | French: | Procédé pour disposer une feuille sur un plateau | [2014/04] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 18.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2012 | AL | 28.02.2018 | CY | 28.02.2018 | CZ | 28.02.2018 | EE | 28.02.2018 | HR | 28.02.2018 | LV | 28.02.2018 | MC | 28.02.2018 | MK | 28.02.2018 | RS | 28.02.2018 | SI | 28.02.2018 | SK | 28.02.2018 | SM | 28.02.2018 | BG | 28.05.2018 | IS | 28.06.2018 | MT | 18.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 18.07.2012 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
MK | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 18.07.2012 | |
AL | 28.02.2018 | ||
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
MC | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SI | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
SM | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 28.02.2018 | ||
EE | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
SK | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.02.2018 | |
CY | 28.02.2018 | ||
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
HR | 28.02.2018 | ||
LV | 28.02.2018 | ||
RS | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 28.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 28.02.2018 | |
HR | 28.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAI]EP2441696 (PACKABLE BV [NL]) [XD] 1-3 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1A-1C * [A] 4,6 [I] 5; | [X]DE4327669 (DIETRICH JOCHEN [DE]) [X] 7-9 * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 49; figures 4-6 * | by applicant | EP2441696 |