EP2557291 - Engine exhaust assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gardner, Jeffrey L 110 Pheasant Lane Hudson, IA Iowa 50643 / US | [2013/07] | Representative(s) | Dehnhardt, Florian Christopher John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2013/07] | Application number, filing date | 12177080.4 | 19.07.2012 | [2013/07] | Priority number, date | US201113207865 | 11.08.2011 Original published format: US201113207865 | [2013/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2557291 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01N13/18, F01N13/14 | [2013/07] | CPC: |
F01N13/143 (EP,US);
F01N2270/02 (EP,US);
F01N2590/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Motorabgasanordnung | [2013/07] | English: | Engine exhaust assembly | [2013/07] | French: | Ensemble d'échappement de moteur | [2013/07] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/39] | 10.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 11.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2548563 (ELLIS SMITH) [X] 1-7 * column 1, line 8 - line 13 * * column 2, line 21 - line 33; figure 1 *; | [X]US2829730 (BARKELEW HARRY D) [X] 1,2,4-7 * column 2, line 43 - line 46 ** column 3, line 59 - line 63; figure 2 *; | [X]US2006243521 (PRICE KENNETH E [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025]; figure 1 * |