EP2559522 - Electric tool with vibration-activated light source [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metabowerke GmbH Metabo-Allee 1 72622 Nürtingen / DE | [2013/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hörmann, Stephan Im Zweifelhardt 3 72639 Neuffen / DE | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Raunecker, Klaus Peter Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Raunecker, Klaus Peter Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12177130.7 | 19.07.2012 | [2013/08] | Priority number, date | DE20111081025 | 16.08.2011 Original published format: DE102011081025 | [2013/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2559522 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/08] | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/00 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
B25F5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrowerkzeug mit vibrationsaktivierter Lichtquelle | [2013/08] | English: | Electric tool with vibration-activated light source | [2013/08] | French: | Outil électrique avec une source de lumière activée par vibrations | [2013/08] | Examination procedure | 29.02.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | EP1068934 |