EP2549224 - Methods for improving integrated photonic device uniformity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states Universiteit Gent Sint-Pietersnieuwstraat 25 9000 Gent / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Absil, Philippe IMEC, IP department c/o IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | 02 /
Selvaraja, Shankar Kumar IMEC, IP department c/o IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Hertoghe, Kris Angèle Louisa, et al DenK iP bvba Hundelgemsesteenweg 1116 9820 Merelbeke / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Hertoghe, Kris Angèle Louisa, et al DenK iP bvba Hundelgemsesteenweg 1114 9820 Merelbeke / BE | Application number, filing date | 12177230.5 | 20.07.2012 | [2013/04] | Priority number, date | US201161510047P | 20.07.2011 Original published format: US 201161510047 P | [2013/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2549224 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2549224 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/02, G02B6/12 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
G01N21/9501 (EP,US);
H01L22/12 (EP,US);
H01L22/20 (EP,US);
G01B2210/56 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] |
Former [2013/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verbesserung der Gleichförmigkeit einer integrierten photonischen Vorrichtung | [2013/04] | English: | Methods for improving integrated photonic device uniformity | [2013/04] | French: | Procédés pour améliorer l'uniformité de dispositifs photoniques intégrés | [2013/04] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 06.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.07.2012 | AL | 04.05.2016 | AT | 04.05.2016 | BE | 04.05.2016 | BG | 04.05.2016 | CY | 04.05.2016 | CZ | 04.05.2016 | DK | 04.05.2016 | EE | 04.05.2016 | ES | 04.05.2016 | FI | 04.05.2016 | HR | 04.05.2016 | IS | 04.05.2016 | IT | 04.05.2016 | LT | 04.05.2016 | LV | 04.05.2016 | MC | 04.05.2016 | MK | 04.05.2016 | NL | 04.05.2016 | PL | 04.05.2016 | RO | 04.05.2016 | RS | 04.05.2016 | SE | 04.05.2016 | SI | 04.05.2016 | SK | 04.05.2016 | SM | 04.05.2016 | TR | 04.05.2016 | IE | 20.07.2016 | LU | 20.07.2016 | CH | 31.07.2016 | LI | 31.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | GB | 04.08.2016 | NO | 04.08.2016 | GR | 05.08.2016 | PT | 05.09.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 20.07.2012 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BG | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 20.07.2016 | ||
LU | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
GB | 04.08.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.07.2012 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IS | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 20.07.2016 | ||
LU | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
GB | 04.08.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 20.07.2012 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
TR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 20.07.2016 | ||
LU | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
GB | 04.08.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.07.2012 | |
AT | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CY | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
MK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 20.07.2016 | ||
LU | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
GB | 04.08.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
IE | 20.07.2016 | ||
LU | 20.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
GB | 04.08.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SI | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.07.2016 | ||
LI | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/17] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
MC | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 04.05.2016 | |
BE | 04.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
SM | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 04.05.2016 | |
CZ | 04.05.2016 | ||
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
PL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
SK | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 04.05.2016 | |
DK | 04.05.2016 | ||
EE | 04.05.2016 | ||
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RO | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 04.05.2016 | |
ES | 04.05.2016 | ||
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
IT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
BE | 31.07.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
SE | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
GR | 05.08.2016 | ||
PT | 05.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 04.05.2016 | |
FI | 04.05.2016 | ||
HR | 04.05.2016 | ||
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
LV | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
RS | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 04.05.2016 | |
LT | 04.05.2016 | ||
NL | 04.05.2016 | ||
NO | 04.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 04.05.2016 | |
NO | 04.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0214915 (UNIV MCMASTER [CA], et al); | [YDA]US6537606 (ALLEN LISA P [US], et al); | [YA]WO2007143501 (COLLINEAR CORP [US], et al) | by applicant | US6537606 |