EP2549418 - Product anti-counterfeit system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M-Media Co., Ltd. 9F, No. 414, Sec. 4, Ren ai Road Taipei City 106 / TW | [2013/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Gi Gi M-Media Co Ltd 9F, No 418, Sec 4, Ren ai Road 106 Taipei city / TW | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Baldwin, Mark, et al Firebird IP 27 Old Gloucester Street London WC1N 3AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Baldwin, Mark, et al Firebird IP 40 Bowling Green Lane London EC1R 0NE / GB | Application number, filing date | 12177237.0 | 20.07.2012 | [2013/04] | Priority number, date | TW20110126082 | 22.07.2011 Original published format: TW 100126082 | [2013/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2549418 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
H04L9/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fälschungssicherungssystem für Produkte | [2013/04] | English: | Product anti-counterfeit system | [2013/04] | French: | Système anti-contrefaçon de produits | [2013/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 29.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 08.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.11.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.11.2013 | Decision despatched |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009194587 (DEVET ROBERTO [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0073] *; | [I]US2005162277 (TEPLITXKY BERTRAND [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0040] *; | [I]US6226619 (HALPERIN ARNOLD [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * column 1, line 19 - line 25 * * column 2, line 30 - line 67 * * column 4, line 1 - line 54 * * column 5, line 1 - line 12 * * column 5, line 42 - line 63 * * column 8, line 9 - line 56 *; | [I]US2009267729 (ROWE HARRY [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0047] * |