EP2669727 - Wide-angle prism-lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd 314 Maetan 3-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon Gyunggi-do 443-743 / KR | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Tae Young 4-1105, Yeonhui Hanyang Apt., Bukgajwa-dong Seodaemum-gu Seoul 120-130 / KR | 02 /
Song, In Taek c/o Samsung Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. 314, Maetan 3-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon 443-743 Gyunggi-do / KR | 03 /
An, Bok Sun c/o Samsung Electro-Mechanics Co., Ltd. 314, Maetan 3-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon 443-743 Gyunggi-do / KR | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Neumann, Ditmar KNH Patentanwälte Neumann Heine Taruttis PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Neumann, Ditmar KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12177490.5 | 23.07.2012 | [2013/49] | Priority number, date | KR20120056828 | 29.05.2012 Original published format: KR 20120056828 | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2669727 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B13/06, G02B17/08 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
G02B13/06 (EP,US);
G02B17/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Weitwinkelprismalinse | [2013/49] | English: | Wide-angle prism-lens | [2013/49] | French: | Lentille-prisme grand angle | [2013/49] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2012 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 16.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/09] | 23.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2014 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2010007969 (TOGINO TAKAYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0091] , [0102] , [0103]; figure 1 * [Y] 5; | [XY]US2004233555 (MATSUNAGA MOTOMI [JP]) [X] 1,5 * figure 1 * [Y] 5; | [X]EP0730179 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraph [0195]; figure 9 * | by applicant | KR100786129B |