EP2574869 - Hinge unit for refrigerator cabinet doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisaplast S.P.A. Via Poliski, 3 46029 Suzzara (MN) / IT | [2013/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guiducci, Alberto CISAPLAST S.P.A. 3, Via Poliski 46029 Suzzara (Mantova) / IT | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Corradini, Corrado, et al Ing. C. Corradini & C. S.r.l. Via Dante Alighieri 4 42121 Reggio Emilia / IT | [2013/14] | Application number, filing date | 12177557.1 | 24.07.2012 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | IT2011RE00074 | 29.09.2011 Original published format: IT RE20110074 | [2013/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2574869 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/02 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
E05D11/1014 (EP);
F25D23/028 (EP);
E05D11/1064 (EP);
E05F1/123 (EP);
E05Y2900/202 (EP);
F25D2323/024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Scharniereinheit für Kühlschranktüren | [2013/14] | English: | Hinge unit for refrigerator cabinet doors | [2013/14] | French: | Unité de charnière pour portes d'armoire de réfrigérateur | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 18.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/28] | 03.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3510986 (BERKOWITZ IRVING L) [A] 1 * column 3, line 42 - column 7, line 20; figures 1,2,3,4 *; | [A]US2005188506 (LEE SEUNG-RYONG [KR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US2008168618 (HOTTMANN PHILIP F [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0037]; figures 2-6 *; | [A]US2005273974 (HAN JAE M [KR]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2006025663 (I ONE INNOTECH CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US5158503 (MITCHELL TERRY L [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 55; figures 4a,5a,6a * |