EP2546250 - Heteroaryl-substituted 1,3 dihydroindol-2-one derivatives and medicaments containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abbott GmbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Ring 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lubisch, Wilfried Hirtenaue 38 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Hornberger, Wilfried Goldener Winkel 14 67434 Neustadt / DE | 03 /
Oost, Thorsten K. Baind 24 88400 Biberach an der Riss / DE | 04 /
Sauer, Daryl Richard 23619 112th Street Trevor, WI Wisconsin 53179 / US | 05 /
Unger, Liliane Wollstr. 129 67065 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
Wernet, Wolfgang Freiheitstr. 73 67434 Neustadt / DE | 07 /
Geneste, Hervé Rehbachstr. 42 67141 Neuhofen / DE | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12177640.5 | 30.09.2004 | [2013/03] | Priority number, date | US20030675300 | 30.09.2003 Original published format: US 675300 | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2546250 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D409/04, C07D417/14, C07D413/14, A61K31/404, A61P25/00 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/06 (EP);
A61P5/38 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D409/04 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
C07D513/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | 12.07.2013 | LT | 12.07.2013 | LV | 12.07.2013 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Heteroarylsubstituierte 1,3-Dihydroindol-2-onderivate und diese enthaltende Medikamente | [2013/03] | English: | Heteroaryl-substituted 1,3 dihydroindol-2-one derivatives and medicaments containing them | [2013/03] | French: | Derives heteroaryle-substitues de 1,3-dihydroindol-2-one et medicaments renfermant ceux-ci | [2013/03] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 27.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/21] | 14.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04765719.2 / EP1667993 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040765719) is 19.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO9315051 (SANOFI ELF [FR]) [YD] 1-16* example -; table 3 *; | [YD]WO9518105 (SANOFI SA [FR], et al) [YD] 1-16 * example -; tables II,III,IV *; | [Y]WO03008407 (SANOFI SYNTHELABO [FR], et al) [Y] 1-16 * example -; table 2 * | by applicant | WO9315051 | WO9518105 | WO9825901 | - GRIEBEL ET AL., PNAS, (2002), vol. 99, page 6370 | - SERRADEIL-LE GAL ET AL., J. PHARM. EXP. THER., (2002), vol. 300, page 1122 | - The Practice of Medicinal Chemistry, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1996), pages 671 - 715 | - Fortschritte der Arzneimittelforschung, BIRKHäUSER VERLAG, (1966), vol. 10, pages 224 - 285 | - TAHARA A ET AL., BRIT. J. PHARMACOL., (1998), vol. 125, pages 1463 - 1470 | - MUNSON PJ; RODBARD D, ANALYTICAL BIOCHEM, (1980), vol. 107, pages 220 - 239 | - PORSOLT RD; LEPICHON M; JALFRE M, "Depression: a new animal model sensitive to antidepressant treatment", NATURE, (1977), vol. 266, pages 730 - 732 | - "Pharmacological models of depression", PORSOLT RD; LENEGRE A; MCARTHUR RA, Animal models in Psychopharmacology, BIRKHAUSER VERLAG, (1991), pages 137 - 159 | - PORSOLT RD; ANTON G; BLAVET N; JALFRE M., "Behavioural despair in rats: a new model sensitive to antidepressant treatments", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (1978), vol. 47, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-2999(78)90118-8, pages 379 - 391, XP025547160 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(78)90118-8 | - A.R. KATRITZKY; A.J. BOULTON, Advances in Heterocyclic Chemistry, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1975), vol. 18, pages 2 - 58 | - J. BRAZIL. CHEM. SOC., (2001), vol. 12, pages 273 - 324 | - G. QUEGUINER ET AL., Advances in Heterocyclic Chemistry, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1991), vol. 52, pages 187 - 304 | - J. HETEROCYCLIC CHEM., (2000), vol. 37, page 615 | - HETEROCYLES, (1994), vol. 37, page 2149 | - J. MED. CHEM., (1997), vol. 40, page 1149 | - J. MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, WILEY, (1992), page 724 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1993), vol. 34, page 5287 | - BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2001), vol. 11, page 2213 | - J. MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, WILEY, (1992), pages 417 - 421,499, | - J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, page 2087 | - J. MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, WILEY, (1992), page 411 | - J. MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, WILEY, (1992), pages 417 - 421 |