EP2689975 - A fabric for an air-bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB Wallentinsvägen 22 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | [2018/28] |
Former [2014/05] | For all designated states Autoliv Development AB 83 Vargarda 447 83 Vårgårda / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stow, David Blackjarnsgatan 12B 41678 Gothenburg / SE | 02 /
Finn, Hugh 26 Bowden Close Culcheth, Warrington WA3 4LG / GB | 03 /
Potter, Kent 908S 950W brigham City, UT 84302 / US | [2014/05] | Representative(s) | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [2018/28] |
Former [2014/05] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12177830.2 | 25.07.2012 | [2014/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2689975 | Date: | 29.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2689975 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/235 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
D03D1/02 (EP,CN,US);
B60R21/232 (US);
B60R21/235 (EP,US);
D03D1/04 (CN,US);
D03D15/283 (EP,CN,US);
D03D15/43 (US);
D03D15/44 (EP,CN,US);
D03D15/46 (EP,US);
D03D15/49 (US);
D03D15/50 (EP,CN,US);
D03D15/587 (EP,CN,US);
B60R2021/23514 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/28] |
Former [2014/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Stoff für einen Airbag | [2014/05] | English: | A fabric for an air-bag | [2014/05] | French: | Tissu pour un airbag | [2014/05] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/33] | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.09.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 01.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17173620.0 / EP3243708 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2012 | AL | 11.07.2018 | AT | 11.07.2018 | CY | 11.07.2018 | CZ | 11.07.2018 | DK | 11.07.2018 | EE | 11.07.2018 | ES | 11.07.2018 | FI | 11.07.2018 | HR | 11.07.2018 | IT | 11.07.2018 | LT | 11.07.2018 | LV | 11.07.2018 | MC | 11.07.2018 | MK | 11.07.2018 | NL | 11.07.2018 | PL | 11.07.2018 | PT | 11.07.2018 | RO | 11.07.2018 | RS | 11.07.2018 | SE | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | SK | 11.07.2018 | SM | 11.07.2018 | TR | 11.07.2018 | IE | 25.07.2018 | LU | 25.07.2018 | MT | 25.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | BG | 11.10.2018 | NO | 11.10.2018 | GR | 12.10.2018 | IS | 11.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 25.07.2012 | |
AL | 11.07.2018 | ||
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PT | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
MT | 25.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
SM | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
IE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
LU | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 11.07.2018 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
HR | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RS | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 11.07.2018 | |
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 11.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2357520 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 20; claim 1 *; | [A]WO0168408 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1,2* page 2, line 20 - line 29; claim 1 *; | [XI]EP2042628 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1,3,4,13 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0030] * [I] 14,15; | [A]EP2374923 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [A] 1,13 * paragraphs [0052] - [0057]; figure - * |