EP2534952 - Insecticide compositions of 2-cyanobenzolsulfonamides and their isomeric forms with improved properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.01.2014 [2014/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50, Building 6100 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Reiner, Dr. Nelly-Sachs-Strasse 23 40789 Monheim / DE | 02 /
Alig, Bernd, Dr. Im Rothsiefen 7 53639 Königswinter / DE | 03 /
Arnold, Christian, Dr. Chulia Street OCBC Centre East 049514 Singapore / SG | 04 /
Pontzen, Rolf, Dr. Am Kloster 69 42799 Leichlingen / DE | 05 /
Müller, Klaus-Helmut, Dr. Solfstrasse 19 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2012/51] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2013/01] | BIP Patents Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 12177999.5 | 21.05.2008 | [2012/51] | Priority number, date | DE20071024575 | 25.05.2007 Original published format: DE102007024575 | [2012/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2534952 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/80, A01N41/06, A01N59/00, A01P7/04, A01P7/02 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
A01N41/10 (EP,US);
A01N41/06 (EP,KR,US);
A01N43/80 (EP,KR,US);
A01N59/00 (KR)
| C-Set: |
A01N41/06, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N41/10, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N41/10, A01N25/30 (EP,US);
A01N43/80, A01N2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/51] | Title | German: | Insektizide Zusammensetzungen von 2-Cyanobenzolsulfonamidverbindungen und ihre isomeren Formen mit verbesserter Wirkung | [2012/51] | English: | Insecticide compositions of 2-cyanobenzolsulfonamides and their isomeric forms with improved properties | [2012/51] | French: | Compositions insecticides des 2-cyanobenzolsulfonamides et leurs formes isomères à effet amélioré | [2012/51] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/01] | 06.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08758649.1 / EP2152083 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080758649) is 04.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]EP0033984 (DUPHAR INT RES [NL]) [XD] 1-21 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 28 * * pages 3-5 * * page 10, lines 25-35 * * page 22, lines 2-4 * * example XIV; tables F,[(c),(s)] * * claims 12,13,16 * [Y] 1-21; | [YD]WO2006056433 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [YD] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2005035486 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [YD] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2006100271 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [YD] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2006100288 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [YD] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0664081 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-21 * page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 30 * * table 1 *; | [Y]WO2005055719 (SYNGENTA LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-21 * page 1, line 9 - page 2, line 26 * * page 4, lines 1-5 * * claims 2,24 *; | [Y]US4888049 (IWASAKI TETSUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-21 * column 1, lines 23-57 * * column 4, lines 13-63 * * example 2; table 2 * * example 3; table 3 *; | [A]WO02098230 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US4343747 (RYU YUMI P, et al) [A] 1-21 * table II * | by applicant | EP0033984 | WO2005035486 | WO2006056433 | WO2006100271 | WO2006100288 | EP0086748 | EP0110829 | EP0133418 | EP0138762 | DE3544436 | EP0191734 | EP0207891 | JPH01319467 | JPH026496 | WO2007060220 | WO2008031712 | WO9517817 | EP0453086 | EP0664081 | FR2600494 | US4844734 | US5462912 | US5538937 | US2003224939 | US2005009880 | US2005096386 | US2842476 | US6645914 | EP0036106 | WO9216108 | WO9835553 | WO0035278 | EP0681865 | - BAUR ET AL., PESTICIDE SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 51, pages 131 - 152 |