EP2570170 - AIR CLEANER ARRANGEMENTS AND CARTRIDGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/14] | Air cleaner arrangements and cartridges | ||
[2017/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DONALDSON COMPANY, INC. 1400 West 94th Street Minneapolis, MN 55440 / US | [2013/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BASEOTTO, Michael Trekschurenstraat 56 3500 HASSELT / BE | 02 /
MERCKX, Roberto Olmstraat 132 1800 VILVOORDE / BE | 03 /
DILS, Julien Kattelynestraat 35 3350 LINTER / BE | 04 /
COULONVAUX, Paul R. Rue de la Frête, 12 1367 Ramillies / BE | [2017/33] |
Former [2013/12] | 01 /
BASEOTTO, Michael Trekschurenstraat 56 3500 HASSELT / BE | ||
02 /
MERCKX, Roberto Olmstraat 132 1800 VILVOORDE / BE | |||
03 /
DILS, Julien Kattelynestraat 35 3350 LINTER / BE | |||
04 /
COULONVAUX, Paul R. Rue de la Frête, 12 1367 Ramillies / BE | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | [2018/05] |
Former [2013/12] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Johannes-Brahms-Platz 1 20355 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12178152.0 | 17.07.2008 | [2013/12] | Priority number, date | US20070961521P | 20.07.2007 Original published format: US 961521 P | US20070961522P | 20.07.2007 Original published format: US 961522 P | US20080072162P | 27.03.2008 Original published format: US 72162 P | US20080126222P | 30.04.2008 Original published format: US 126222 P | [2017/33] |
Former [2013/12] | US20070961521P | 20.07.2007 | |
US20070961522P | 20.07.2007 | ||
US20080072162P | 27.03.2008 | ||
US20080126222P | 27.03.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2570170 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2570170 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/24 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
B01D46/2414 (EP,US);
B01D46/24 (RU);
B01D46/009 (EP,US);
B01D46/52 (RU);
B01D46/64 (EP,US);
F02M35/02416 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/05] |
Former [2013/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LUFTREINIGERANORDNUNG UND PATRONEN | [2018/04] | English: | AIR CLEANER ARRANGEMENTS AND CARTRIDGES | [2017/30] | French: | SYSTEME D'EPURATION D'AIR ET CARTOUCHES | [2018/04] |
Former [2013/12] | Luftreinigeranordnung und Patronen, | ||
Former [2013/14] | Air cleaner arrangements and cartridges | ||
Former [2013/12] | Systeme d'epuration d'air et cartouches | Examination procedure | 20.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/44] | 21.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/12] | 08.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/20] | 27.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 20.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08781967.8 / EP2175960 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080781967) is 22.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 07.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.12.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.01.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 08.01.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2008 | AT | 31.01.2018 | CY | 31.01.2018 | CZ | 31.01.2018 | DK | 31.01.2018 | EE | 31.01.2018 | FI | 31.01.2018 | HR | 31.01.2018 | LV | 31.01.2018 | MC | 31.01.2018 | PT | 31.01.2018 | RO | 31.01.2018 | SI | 31.01.2018 | SK | 31.01.2018 | BG | 30.04.2018 | NO | 30.04.2018 | GR | 01.05.2018 | IS | 31.05.2018 | IE | 17.07.2018 | LU | 17.07.2018 | MT | 17.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 17.07.2008 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
MT | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 17.07.2008 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
MT | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
MT | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 17.07.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
LU | 17.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006086075 (SCOTT JAMES R [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0190] - paragraph [0196] * * paragraph [0279] - paragraph [0282] * * paragraph [0373] *; | [XD]WO2006119414 (DONALDSON CO INC [US], et al) [XD] 1-19 * abstract * * page 2, line 18 - line 29 *; | [A]EP1754525 (DONALDSON CO INC [US]) [A] 1-19* abstract * | Examination | WO9612550 | WO9942719 | by applicant | US5547480 | US6039778 | US6652614 | US6955701 | US2006254229 | WO2007009040 | WO2007022171 |