EP2551824 - Image processing device for accurately identifying region in image without increase in memory requirement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi 467-8561 / JP | [2023/32] |
Former [2013/05] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZAWA, Ryohei Nagoya, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | 02 /
KONDO, Masaki Nagoya, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | [2023/30] |
Former [2013/05] | 01 /
Kondo, Masaki BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1-1 Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | ||
02 /
Ozawa, Ryohei BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1-1 Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/32] |
Former [2013/05] | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12178349.2 | 27.07.2012 | [2013/05] | Priority number, date | JP20110167178 | 29.07.2011 Original published format: JP 2011167178 | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2551824 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2551824 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2551824 | Date: | 09.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/96, G06V30/413 | [2023/08] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T7/77 (EP,US);
G06V10/96 (EP,US);
G06V30/413 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10024 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20076 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/05] | G06T7/00, G06K9/00, G06K9/38, G06K9/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/30] |
Former [2013/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung zur genauen Identifikation eines Bereichs auf einem Bild ohne Erhöhung des Speicherbedarfs | [2013/05] | English: | Image processing device for accurately identifying region in image without increase in memory requirement | [2013/05] | French: | Dispositif de traitement d'image pour identifier avec précision une région dans l'image sans augmentation de la capacité de mémoire | [2013/05] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/30] | 24.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2019 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.08.2023 | CZ | 09.08.2023 | DK | 09.08.2023 | EE | 09.08.2023 | ES | 09.08.2023 | FI | 09.08.2023 | HR | 09.08.2023 | IT | 09.08.2023 | LT | 09.08.2023 | LV | 09.08.2023 | NL | 09.08.2023 | PL | 09.08.2023 | RO | 09.08.2023 | RS | 09.08.2023 | SE | 09.08.2023 | SK | 09.08.2023 | SM | 09.08.2023 | NO | 09.11.2023 | GR | 10.11.2023 | IS | 09.12.2023 | PT | 11.12.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
EE | 09.08.2023 | ||
ES | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SK | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
CZ | 09.08.2023 | ||
DK | 09.08.2023 | ||
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RO | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
SM | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
HR | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
LV | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
PL | 09.08.2023 | ||
RS | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
PT | 11.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 09.08.2023 | |
FI | 09.08.2023 | ||
LT | 09.08.2023 | ||
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
SE | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | ||
IS | 09.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 09.08.2023 | |
NL | 09.08.2023 | ||
NO | 09.11.2023 | ||
GR | 10.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05225378 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]US5991515 (FALL RICHARD N [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1006717 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [I]US2006133679 (YOSHIDA HIROKI [JP]) [I] 1-13 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0079]; figures 4, 9 * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0108] *; | [A]US2006274376 (BAILEY JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2008123945 (ANDREW JAMES PHILIP [NZ], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0220] - paragraph [0225] * * sec. 2.2.4; paragraph [0227] *; | [A]US2008137954 (TANG YICHUAN [CA], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009148039 (CHEN YU-LING [AU], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009297024 (DAI XIAOYAN [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009316218 (MIYAGI ARATA [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2010220927 (KIM SEUNG-HUN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A] - PIETIKDINEN M ET AL, "Edge-based method for text detection from complex document images", DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION, 2001. PROCEEDINGS. SIXTH INTERNATIO NAL CONFERENCE ON SEATTLE, WA, USA 10-13 SEPT. 2001, LOS AALMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (20010910), doi:10.1109/ICDAR.2001.953800, ISBN 978-0-7695-1263-1, pages 286 - 291, XP010560518 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDAR.2001.953800 |