EP2554600 - Silicone resin composition, encapsulating material, and light emitting diode device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimura, Ryuichi c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
Mitani, Munehisa c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12178445.8 | 30.07.2012 | [2013/06] | Priority number, date | JP20110170805 | 04.08.2011 Original published format: JP 2011170805 | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2554600 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2554600 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
C08L83/04 (EP,US);
H01L33/00 (KR);
H01L23/296 (EP,US);
C08G77/12 (EP,US);
C08G77/16 (EP,US);
C08G77/20 (EP,US);
C08K5/5425 (EP,US);
C08K5/5435 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Silikonharzzusammensetzung, Verkapselungsmaterial und lichtemittierende Diodenvorrichtung | [2013/06] | English: | Silicone resin composition, encapsulating material, and light emitting diode device | [2013/06] | French: | Composition de résine de silicone, matériau d'encapsulation et dispositif à diode électroluminescente | [2013/06] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 04.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007032595 (YAMAKAWA NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,7 * paragraphs [0120] - [0121] - [0001]; example 1 * [Y] 2,5,6; | [XP]EP2463334 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [XP] 1,4-7 * paragraphs [0051] - [0055]; example 1 *; | [E]EP2530105 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [E] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0106] - [0120]; example 3 *; | [Y]US2010148378 (KATAYAMA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,5,6 * paragraphs [0149] - [0162]; example 10 * | by applicant | JP2010265436 |