EP2544063 - Network device interface for digitally interfacing data channels to a controller via a network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ellerbrock, Philip, J. 351 Buckington Street St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | 02 /
Konz, Daniel, W. 8029 Leo Ln Lincoln, NE 68505-3211 / US | 03 /
Winkelmann, Joseph, P. 38 Engelwood Court St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | 04 /
Grant, Robert, L. 1 Jaquetta St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | [2013/25] |
Former [2013/02] | 01 /
Ellerbrock, Philip, J. 351 Buckington Street St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | ||
02 /
Konz, Daniel, W. 1513 Kew Gardens Florissant, MO 63031 / US | |||
03 /
Winkelmann, Joseph, P. 38 Engelwood Court St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | |||
04 /
Grant, Robert, L. 1 Jaquetta St. Peters, MO 63376 / US | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 12178821.0 | 05.11.2001 | [2013/02] | Priority number, date | US20000254136P | 08.12.2000 Original published format: US 254136 P | US20000735146 | 12.12.2000 Original published format: US 735146 | [2013/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2544063 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2544063 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418 | [2013/02] | CPC: |
H04L12/40032 (EP,US);
H04L12/4135 (EP,US);
H04L25/4904 (EP,US);
H04L2012/40215 (EP,US);
H04L2012/4028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2013/02] | Title | German: | Netzwerkvorrichtungsschnittstelle zur digitalen Schnittstellenherstellung von Datenkanälen mit einem Steuergerät über ein Netzwerk | [2013/02] | English: | Network device interface for digitally interfacing data channels to a controller via a network | [2013/02] | French: | Interface de dispositif de réseau pour interfacer numériquement des voies de données avec une unité de commande par lýintermédiaire dýun réseau | [2013/02] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 09.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 13.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/19] | 19.12.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01988185.3 / EP1356629 | EP10186254.8 / EP2317411 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010988185) is 06.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5654983 (SAUSER JR MARTIN H [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 7, line 29 - column 15, line 61 * [Y] 6; | [XY]DE10014671 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5 * page 7, line 35 - page 9, line 35; figure 3 * [Y] 6; | [Y]US4969147 (MARKKULA JR ARMAS C [US], et al) [Y] 6 * column 7, line 35 - column 62, line 62 * | by applicant | US20000254137 |