EP2692813 - Abrasive grit with ridges of varying heights [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harzer, Andreas Schelmenpfad 34 71701 Schwieberdingen / DE | 02 /
Hejtmann, Georg Seelhofenstrasse 43 74395 Mundelsheim / DE | 03 /
Stedile, Petra Urbanstrasse 81 73728 Esslingen / DE | 04 /
Buehler, Elisabeth Obere Kelterstrasse 7 71732 Tamm / DE | [2014/06] | Application number, filing date | 12178930.9 | 02.08.2012 | [2014/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2692813 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/14, B24D3/14, C04B35/111, B24D7/18, B24D3/08, C09K3/18, B60S1/52, B60S1/50, B60S1/48, B60S1/38, B60R16/00, B60S1/02, B08B17/06, H01L21/00, F02M37/08, G01N27/00 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
B28B7/24 (EP);
B28B1/29 (EP);
C04B35/1115 (EP);
C04B35/6261 (EP);
C09K3/1463 (EP);
C09K3/18 (EP);
C04B2235/3206 (EP);
C04B2235/6027 (EP);
C04B2235/6567 (EP);
C04B2235/94 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schleifkorn mit Erhebungen verschiedener Höhen | [2014/06] | English: | Abrasive grit with ridges of varying heights | [2014/06] | French: | Grain abrasif avec soulèvements de différentes hauteurs | [2014/06] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/05] | 11.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US5201916 (BERG TODD A [US], et al); | [XI]US5672097 (HOOPMAN TIMOTHY L [US]); | [XI]US5681217 (HOOPMAN TIMOTHY L [US], et al); | [XI]US2006288648 (THURBER ERNEST L [US], et al) | by applicant | US5201916 | EP0615816 | WO9612776 | WO2009085841 | WO2010077495 | WO2010077518 | WO2010077491 | WO2010077519 | WO2010077509 | WO2011068724 | WO2011068714 | WO2011087649 | WO2011109188 | WO2011139562 | WO2012018903 | WO2012061016 | WO2012061033 |