EP2520596 - Linear precipitated polymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nguyen Kim, Son Zedernweg 9 69502 Hemsbach / DE | 02 /
Fast, Ina Anna-Maus-Straße 30 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Jürgen BASF Personal Care and Nutrition GmbH Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2012/45] | Application number, filing date | 12179005.9 | 28.01.2009 | [2012/45] | Priority number, date | EP20080150949 | 01.02.2008 Original published format: EP 08150949 | [2012/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2520596 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08F226/06 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
C08F226/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | Lineares Fällungspolymerisat | [2012/45] | English: | Linear precipitated polymer | [2012/45] | French: | Polymère précipité linéaire | [2012/45] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 08.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/45] | 13.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09706844.9 / EP2240524 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090706844) is 24.11.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2689814 (RICOH KK [JP]) [X] 1 * table 1 * [I] 2-12; | [XI]JP2007204625 (SUGAWARA IND) [X] 1 * examples 4, Vergleich 3,4 * [I] 2-12 | by applicant | WO0039176 | US3915921 | WO9721744 | EP0982021 | US4395524 | US4432881 | DE4213971 | EP0893117 | EP0913143 | EP1064924 | US5015708 | WO0162809 | WO2004058837 | WO2007012610 | WO2007010035 | WO2006106140 | WO2006106114 | - Kosmetik und Hygiene von Kopf bis Fuß, WILEY-VCH, (2004), pages 131 - 134 | - Kosmetik und Hygiene von Kopf bis Fuß, WILEY-VCH, (2004), pages 235 - 236 | - Kosmetik und Hygiene von Kopf bis Fuß, WILEY-VCH, (2004), pages 112 - 122 | - Kosmetik und Hygiene von Kopf bis Fuß, WILEY-VCH, (2004), pages 128 - 134 |