EP2693255 - Method and apparatus pertaining to an augmented-reality keyboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 01.08.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2014/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Griffin, Jason Tyler 295 Phillip Street, Ext 72251 Waterloo Ontaria N2L 3W8 / CA | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Electronics 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12179194.1 | 03.08.2012 | [2014/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2693255 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01, G06F3/02, G06F3/023, G06F3/01 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
G02B27/017 (EP);
G06F3/012 (EP);
G06F3/0202 (EP);
G06F3/023 (EP);
G02B2027/0141 (EP);
G02B2027/0178 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für eine Tastatur mit erweiterter Realität | [2014/06] | English: | Method and apparatus pertaining to an augmented-reality keyboard | [2014/06] | French: | Procédé et appareil relatifs à un clavier en réalité augmentée | [2014/06] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2012 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 02.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/36] | 31.07.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2014 | 12.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2012089576 (UNIV DANMARKS TEKNISKE [DK], et al) [X] 1,4-7,9-12 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 1, line 3 - line 7 * * page 4, line 1 - line 21 * * page 7, line 33 - page 9, line 10 * * page 12, line 16 - line 24 * * page 13, line 12 - line 27 * [Y] 2,3 [I] 8; | [YA]US2004218963 (VAN DIEPEN PETER JAN [CA], et al) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0042] * [A] 1,5-8,10-12; | [A]DE102009034153 (HEINE ANNA MARIA [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0018] * |