EP2608414 - Channel encoding method and decoding method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tropf, Hermann Jagstweg 18 68789 St. Leon-Rot / DE | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | 2s-ip Schramm Schneider Bertagnoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Part mbB Postfach 86 02 67 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Bettinger Schneider Schramm Postfach 860267 81629 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12180374.6 | 14.08.2012 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | DE201110110121 | 15.08.2011 Original published format: DE102011110121 | [2013/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2608414 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2608414 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H03M13/11, H03M13/45 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
H03M13/11 (EP);
H03M13/1171 (EP);
H03M13/1191 (EP);
H03M13/134 (EP);
H03M13/45 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kanalcodierungsverfahren und Decodierungsverfahren | [2013/26] | English: | Channel encoding method and decoding method | [2013/26] | French: | Procédé de codage de canal et procédé de décodage | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 24.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - W.Cary Huffman, Vera Pless, Fundamentals of Error-Correcting Codes, Cambridge University Press, (2003), pages 3 - 6, XP002720462 [X] 1,2,6,9,10 * the whole document * * page 6 * | [X] - Ron M. Roth, Introduction to Coding Theory, Cambridge University Press, (2006), pages 26 - 31, XP002720463 [X] 1,6-10 * the whole document * * page 28 * | [X] - JUN LIN ET AL, "An Efficient VLSI Architecture for Nonbinary LDPC Decoders", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS II: EXPRESS BRIEFS, IEEE, US, (20100101), vol. 57, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TCSII.2009.2036542, ISSN 1549-7747, pages 51 - 55, XP011334150 [X] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCSII.2009.2036542 | [A] - CHANGLONG XU ET AL, "A low complexity decoding algorithm for extended turbo product codes", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080101), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TWC.2008.060518, ISSN 1536-1276, pages 43 - 47, XP011381094 [A] 4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TWC.2008.060518 | [A] - JACK K. WOLF, "Efficient Maximum Likelihood Decoding of Linear Block Codes Using a Trellis", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, (1978), vol. 24, no. 1, XP002720415 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TIT.1978.1055821 | [A] - WAI HAN FONG ET AL, "Multiple Phased-Burst Correcting Superposition Product LDPC Codes", ICC 2011 - 2011 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS - 5-9 JUNE 2011 - KYOTO, JAPAN, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20110605), doi:10.1109/ICC.2011.5962812, ISBN 978-1-61284-232-5, pages 1 - 5, XP031908566 [A] 3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/icc.2011.5962812 | by applicant | US2004163030 | US2010005368 |