EP2562525 - Systems and methods for making temperature and pressure measurements utilizing a tunable laser diode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Badami, Vivek Venugopal General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | 02 /
Mitra, Chayan General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Cleary, Fidelma GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12180476.9 | 14.08.2012 | [2013/09] | Priority number, date | US201113216439 | 24.08.2011 Original published format: US201113216439 | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2562525 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Classification | IPC: | G01L11/02 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
G01L11/02 (EP,US);
G01L19/0092 (EP,US);
G01L23/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Durchführung von Temperatur- und Druckmessungen mit einer abstimmbaren Laserdiode | [2013/09] | English: | Systems and methods for making temperature and pressure measurements utilizing a tunable laser diode | [2013/09] | French: | Systèmes et procédés pour réaliser des mesures de température et de pression utilisant une diode laser accordable | [2013/09] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/33] | 01.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |