EP2528147 - Nickel-rich and manganese-rich quaternary metal oxide materials as cathodes for lithium-ion and lithium-ion polymer batteries [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techelios, LLC 100 Corson Street Pasadena, CA 91103 / US | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Kaiyuan c/o Techelios, LLC 100 Corson Street Pasadena, CA California 91103 / US | 02 /
Agarwal, Naveen c/o Techelios, LLC 100 Corson Street Pasadena, CA California 91103 / US | 03 /
Kim, Jaeho c/o Techelios, LLC 100 Corson Street Pasadena, CA California 91103 / US | 04 /
Mc Grath, Kevin P. c/o Techelios, LLC 100 Corson Street Pasadena, CA California 91103 / US | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/22] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/48] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12180686.3 | 22.12.2000 | [2012/48] | Priority number, date | US19990173911P | 29.12.1999 Original published format: US 173911 P | US20000742738 | 21.12.2000 Original published format: US 742738 | US20000742754 | 21.12.2000 Original published format: US 742754 | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2528147 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2528147 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/48 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/48 (KR);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M4/1391 (EP,US);
H01M4/38 (KR);
H01M4/485 (EP,US);
H01M4/505 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
H01M4/0471 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2016/22] |
Former [2012/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Nickelreiche und manganreiche quaternäre Metalloxidmaterialien als Kathoden für Lithiumionen- und Lithiumionenpolymerbatterien | [2016/14] | English: | Nickel-rich and manganese-rich quaternary metal oxide materials as cathodes for lithium-ion and lithium-ion polymer batteries | [2012/48] | French: | Riche en nickel et de manganèse riche quaternaire matériaux d'oxyde métallique comme cathodes pour les batteries lithium-ion et lithium-ion polymère | [2012/48] |
Former [2012/48] | Nickelreiche und manganreiche quaternäre Metalloxidmaterialien als Kathoden für Lithiumionen- und Lithiumionenpolymerbatterien | Examination procedure | 27.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/28] | 16.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00988392.7 / EP1247303 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000988392) is 17.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2016 | BE | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | DK | 01.06.2016 | ES | 01.06.2016 | FI | 01.06.2016 | IT | 01.06.2016 | MC | 01.06.2016 | NL | 01.06.2016 | SE | 01.06.2016 | TR | 01.06.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | IE | 22.12.2016 | LU | 22.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 22.12.2016 | ||
LU | 22.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 01.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0872450 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11,16 * page 3, line 3 - line 44 * * page 4, line 18 - line 29 * * examples 20,23 * * table 1 * [A] 6,12-15; | [X]JPH11307094 ; | [X]EP0849817 (JAPAN STORAGE BATTERY CO LTD [JP]) [X] 16 * page 2, line 46 - line 55 * * page 4, line 13 - line 17 * * example 1 * * claims 1,6 *; | [X]JPH10199525 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000229), vol. 2000, no. 20, & JP11307094 A 19991105 (CHUO DENKI KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 16 * abstract * | [X] - RODRIGUEZ M A ET AL, "In-situ X-ray diffraction of layered LiCoO/sub 2/-type cathode materials", INTERCALATION COMPOUNDS FOR BATTERY MATERIALS. PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM (ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY PROCEEDINGS VOL.99-24), INTERCALATION COMPOUNDS FOR BATTERY MATERIALS. PROCEEDINGS FO THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, HONOLULU, HI, USA, 1, 2000, Pennington, NJ, USA, Electrochem. Soc, USA, (19991017), vol. 99, no. 24, ISBN 1-56677-247-8, pages 85 - 92, XP000994589 [X] 16 * page 86, paragraphs 1,2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981031), vol. 1998, no. 12, & JP10199525 A 19980731 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 16 * abstract * | by applicant | US5370948 | US5264201 | US5626635 | US5783333 | US5795558 | US5718989 | US6007947 | WO9816900 | US5804335 | US5792574 | US5609975 | US5599642 | US5514496 | US5490320 | - MANTHIRAM ET AL., JOM, (1997), vol. 49, page 43 | - THACKERAY, M. ET AL., ELECTROCHEMICAL AND SOLID STATE LETTERS, (1998), vol. 1, pages 7 - 9 | - HUANG D., ADVANCED BATTERY TECHNOLOGY, (1998), page 21 | - CEDAR ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 392, page 694 | - CEDAR ET AL., COMPUTATIONAL MATERIALS SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 161, page 8 | - JANG ET AL., ELECTROCHEMICAL AND SOLID STATE LETTERS, (1998), vol. 13, page 1 | - ZHONG ET AL., J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 144, page 205 | - AMINE ET AL., J. POWER SOURCES, (1997), vol. 68, page 604 | - FEY ET AL., J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1994), vol. 141, page 2279 | - SIGALA ET AL., SOLID STATE IONICS, (1995), vol. 81, page 167 | - EIN-ELI ET AL., J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1998), vol. 145, page 1238 | - LIU ET AL., J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1996), vol. 879, page 143 | - EIN-ELI ET AL., J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1999), vol. 146, page 908 | - GAO ET AL., ELECTROCHEM. & SOLID STATE LETTERS, (1998), vol. 1, page 117 | - SHRIVER ET AL., Inorganic Chemistry, W.H. FREEMAN AND COMPANY, (1990), page 654 |