EP2587067 - Multiple coaxial pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Claus-Heinrich Gößlinghoff Ewaldstr. 20 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Popp, Carsten, et al Vaillant GmbH IR-IP Berghauser Straße 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 12180724.2 | 16.08.2012 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | DE201110116957 | 26.10.2011 Original published format: DE102011116957 | [2013/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2587067 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2587067 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F04D13/12, F04D15/00 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
F04D13/12 (EP);
F04D15/0005 (EP);
F04D15/0072 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/18] | F04D13/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Multiple Koaxialpumpe | [2013/18] | English: | Multiple coaxial pump | [2013/18] | French: | Pompe coaxiale multiple | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/19] | 19.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH557959 (KLEIN SCHANZLIN & BECKER AG) [X] 1,4,7 * column 2, line 31 - line 65; figure 1 *; | [XA]GB602408 (WATEROUS CO) [X] 1,3,7 * page 2, line 38 - line 83; figures 1,2 * * page 3, line 35 - line 64; figure 4 * * page 3, line 86 - line 95; figure 4 * * page 4, line 104 - page 5, line 36; figure 8 * * page 5, line 72 - line 121; figure 9 * [A] 5,6; | [X]US3801224 (EBERHARDT H) [X] 1-3,7 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 42; figures 1,2,3,3a *; | [X]DE4021410 (OPLAENDER WILO WERK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 2 - line 57; figures 1-2 * * figure 3; claim 1 *; | [X]GB132353 (J. STONE & COMPANY LTD.) [X] 1,3,8 * page 4, line 36 - line 48 * * page 5, line 39 - page 6, line 11; figure 1 *; | [X]CH395744 (SCHNEIDER EMIL [CH]) [X] 1,3,8 * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 2; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE1808411 | DE3743261 |