EP2527330 - Inhibitors of the hedgehog pathway [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exelixis Patent Company LLC 210 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bahceci, Suley 2355 Holland Street San Mateo, CA California 94403 / US | 02 /
Bajjalieh, William 2086 45th Avenue San Francisco, CA California 94116 / US | 03 /
Chen, Jeff 140 South Van Ness Ave. Apt 407 San Francisco, CA California 94103 / US | 04 /
Epshteyn, Sergey 2922 Southwycke Terrace Fremont, CA California 94536 / US | 05 /
Forsyth, Timothy Patrick 1928 Wingate Way Hayward, CA California 94541 / US | 06 /
Huynh, Tai Phat 10 Waterside Plaza 27E New York, NY New York 10010 / US | 07 /
Kim, Byung Gyu 10 De Sabla Road Apt. 801 San Mateo, CA California 94402 / US | 08 /
Leahy, James W 1185 Camellia Court San Leandro, CA California 94577 / US | 09 /
Lee, Matthew Sangyup 4045 Moraga Street San Francisco, CA California 94122 / US | 10 /
Lewis, Gary L 200 Randall Street San Francisco, CA California 94131 / US | 11 /
Mac, Morrison B 2567 30th Avenue San Francisco, CA California 94116 / US | 12 /
Mann, Grace 554 Ventura Way San Mateo, CA California 94403 / US | 13 /
Marlowe, Charles K 636 California Way Emerald Hills, CA California 94062 / US | 14 /
Ridgway, Brian Hugh 2827 Hallmark Drive Belmont, CA California 94002 / US | 15 /
Sangalang, Joan C 131 Rubicon Circle Danville, CA 94526 / US | 16 /
Shi, Xian 2202 Shelter Creek Lane San Bruno, CA California 94066 / US | 17 /
Takeuchi, Craig Stacy 1090 Carolan Ave. 302 Burlingame, CA California 94010 / US | 18 /
Wang, Yong 465 Biscayne Avenue Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | 19 /
Tesfai, Zerom 23219 Canyon Terrace Drive Castro Valley, CA California 94552 / US | [2013/10] |
Former [2012/48] | 01 /
Bahceci, Suley 2355 Holland Street San Mateo, CA California 94403 / US | ||
02 /
Bajjalieh, William 2086 45th Avenue San Francisco, CA California 94116 / US | |||
03 /
Chen, Jeff 140 South Van Ness Ave. Apt 407 San Francisco, CA California 94103 / US | |||
04 /
Epshteyn, Sergey 2922 Southwycke Terrace Fremont, CA California 94536 / US | |||
05 /
Forsyth, Timothy Patrick 1928 Wingate Way Hayward, CA California 94541 / US | |||
06 /
Huynh, Tai Phat 10 Waterside Plaza 27E New York, NY New York 10010 / US | |||
07 /
Kim, Byung Gyu 10 De Sabla Road Apt. 801 San Mateo, CA California 94402 / US | |||
08 /
Leahy, James W 1185 Camellia Court San Leandro, CA California 94577 / US | |||
09 /
Lee, Matthew Sangyup 4045 Moraga Street San Francisco, CA California 94122 / US | |||
10 /
Lewis, Gary L 200 Randall Street San Francisco, CA California 94131 / US | |||
11 /
Mac, Morrison B 2567 30th Avenue San Francisco, CA California 94116 / US | |||
12 /
Mann, Grace 554 Ventura Way San Mateo, CA California 94403 / US | |||
13 /
Marlowe, Charles K 636 California Way Emerald Hills, CA California 94062 / US | |||
14 /
Ridgway, Brian Hugh 2827 Hallmark Drive Belmont, CA California 94002 / US | |||
15 /
Sangalang, Joan C 679 Fairmont Ave, 5 Mountain View, CA California 94041 / US | |||
16 /
Shi, Xian 2202 Shelter Creek Lane San Bruno, CA California 94066 / US | |||
17 /
Takeuchi, Craig Stacy 1090 Carolan Ave. 302 Burlingame, CA California 94010 / US | |||
18 /
Wang, Yong 465 Biscayne Avenue Foster City, CA California 94404 / US | |||
19 /
Tesfai, Zerom 23219 Canyon Terrace Drive Castro Valley, CA California 94552 / US | Representative(s) | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/48] | Application number, filing date | 12180902.4 | 13.03.2008 | [2012/48] | Priority number, date | US20070918160P | 14.03.2007 Original published format: US 918160 P | US20070962617P | 30.07.2007 Original published format: US 962617 P | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2527330 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/42, C07D239/70, C07D239/84, C07D239/95, C07D401/04, C07D403/12, A61P35/00, A61K31/517, A61K31/519 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
C07D239/42 (EP,KR,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D239/70 (EP,US);
C07D239/84 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/48] | Extension states | AL | 23.05.2013 | BA | 23.05.2013 | MK | 23.05.2013 | RS | 23.05.2013 | Title | German: | Hemmer des Hedgehog-Pfads | [2012/48] | English: | Inhibitors of the hedgehog pathway | [2012/48] | French: | Inhibiteurs de la voie Hedgehog | [2012/48] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 28.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/26] | 19.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/26] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08732145.1 / EP2134695 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080732145) is 14.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005033288 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * compounds of :;; claims 19-20 * * use in therapy of cell proliferative disorders :;; claim 58 ** Mode of action is hedgehog signalling pathway modulation :;; claims 45, 49, 56, 57 *; | [A]WO2006028958 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * N-(3-(Pyridin-2-yl-phenyl)-4-alkylsulfonylmethyl)-benzamides, e.g. :;; examples 101, 243, 271 * * use in treatment of cancer :;; claim 33 * * mode of action is hedgehog pathway signalling modulation :; page 1, line 20; claim 36 *; | [A]WO2006078283 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * compounds disclosed on :; page 18 - page 34; compounds 1-113 * * use in therapy of cancer :;; claim 33 * * Mode of action is hedgehog signalling pathway modullation :; page 4, line 1 - line 2 * | by applicant | US4107288 | US5145684 | - J. C. SMITH, CELL, (1994), vol. 76, pages 193 - 196 | - N. PERRIMON, CELL, (1995), vol. 80, pages 517 - 520 | - C. CHIANG ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 83, page 407 | - M. J. BITGOOD ET AL., CURR. BIOL., (1996), vol. 6, page 296 | - A. VORTKAMP ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 273, page 613 | - C. J. LAI ET AL., DEVELOPMENT, (1995), vol. 121, page 2349 | - J. A. PORTER ET AL., SCIENCE, vol. 274, page 1996 | - M. FLETZ ET AL., DEVELOPMENT, (1994), pages 43 - 51 | - M. HYNES ET AL., NEURON, (1995), vol. 15, pages 35 - 44 | - T. NAKAMURA ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMM., (1997), vol. 237, pages 485 - 469 | - RUBIN, L. L.; DE SAUVAGE, F. J., NAT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2006), vol. 5, pages 1026 - 1033 | - KASPER, M., EUR J CANCER, (2006), vol. 42, pages 437 - 445 | - JOHNSON, SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 272, pages 1668 - 1671 | - HAHN, CELL, (1996), vol. 85, pages 841 - 851 | - UNDEN, CANCER RES, (1996), vol. 56, pages 4562 - 4565 | - CHIDAMBARAM, CANCER RES, (1996), vol. 56, pages 4599 - 4601 | - WOLTER, M., CANCER RES, (1997), vol. 57, pages 2581 - 2585 | - REIFENBERGER, J., CANCER RES, (1998), vol. 58, pages 1798 - 1803 | - LAM, C. W., ONCOGENE, (1999), vol. 18, pages 833 - 836 | - COUVE-PRIVAT, S., CANCER RES, (2002), vol. 62, pages 7186 - 7189 | - XIE, J., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 90 - 92 | - RAFFEL, C., CANCER RES, (1997), vol. 57, pages 842 - 845 | - PIETSCH, T., CANCER RES, (1997), vol. 57, pages 2085 - 2088 | - VORECHOVSKY, I., ONCOGENE, (1997), vol. 15, pages 361 - 366 | - XIE, J., CANCER RES, (1997), vol. 57, pages 2369 - 2372 | - CALZADA-WACK, J., HUM MUTAT, (2002), vol. 20, pages 233 - 234 | - BERMAN, D., NATURE, (2003), vol. 425, pages 846 - 851 | - THAYER, S. P., NATURE, (2003), vol. 425, pages 851 - 856 | - PASCA DI MAGLIANO, M., GENES DEV, (2006), vol. 20, pages 3161 - 3173 | - GAO, J., GENE THER, (2006), vol. 13, pages 1587 - 1594 | - KARHADKAR, S. S., NATURE, (2004), vol. 431, pages 707 - 712 | - SANCHEZ, P., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2004), vol. 101, pages 12561 - 12566 | - SHENG, T., MOL CANCER, (2004), vol. 3, no. 29 | - FAN, L., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2004), vol. 145, pages 3961 - 3970 | - FUKAYA, M., GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2006), vol. 131, pages 14 - 29 | - OHTA, M., CANCER RES, (2005), vol. 65, pages 10822 - 10829 | - WATKINS, D. N., NATURE, (2003), vol. 422, pages 313 - 317 | - YUAN, Z., ONCOGENE, (2007), vol. 26, pages 1046 - 1055 | - MA, X., INT J CANCER, (2006), vol. 118, pages 139 - 148 | - SIMS-MOURTADA, J., CANCER RES, (2006), vol. 12, pages 6565 - 6572 | - STECCA, B., PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2007), vol. 104, pages 5895 - 5900 | - MA, X., CARCINOGENESIS, (2005), vol. 26, pages 1698 - 1705 | - CLEMENT, V., CURR BIOL, (2007), vol. 17, pages 165 - 172 | - LI, C., HEIDT, CANCER RES, (2007), vol. 67, pages 1030 - 1037 | - LIU, S., CANCER RES, (2006), vol. 66, pages 6063 - 6071 | - PEACOCK, C. D., PNAS, (2007), vol. 104, pages 4048 - 4053 | - RICCI-VITIANI, L., NATURE, (2007), vol. 445, pages 111 - 115 | - BEACHY, P. A., NATURE, (2004), vol. 432, pages 324 - 331 | - BAO, S., NATURE, (2006), vol. 444, pages 756 - 760 | - DEAN, M., NAT REV CANCER, (2005), vol. 5, pages 275 - 284 | - S. M. BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - T. HIGUCHI; V. STELLA, Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems, A.C.S. SYMPOSIUM SERIES, vol. 14 | - CHEN ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 14071 - 14076 | - CHEN, GENES DEV, (2002), vol. 16, pages 2743 - 2748 | - Fieser and Fieser's Reagents for Organic Synthesis, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1991), vol. 1-17 | - Rodd's Chemistry of Carbon Compounds, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1989), vol. 1-5 | - Organic Reactions, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (1991), vol. 1-40 | - March's Advanced Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY AND SONS | - FRANK-KAMENETSKY, JBIO, (2002), vol. 1, page 10 |